Alfonso v. Mougis Logistics Corp.
Plaintiff: Donald Alfonso
Defendant: Mougis Logistics Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05302
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Michael L. Elkins, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24918165. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #20 MOTION for Joshua M. Entin, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24918292. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar for this state.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua M. Entin, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24918292. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald Alfonso. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua M. Entin, Esq., #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Klein, Nolan) Modified on 8/12/2021 (bcu).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael L. Elkins, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24918165. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald Alfonso. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael L. Elkins, Esq., #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Klein, Nolan) Modified on 8/12/2021 (bcu).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support with Exhibit served on Donald Alfonso c/o Nolan Klein Esq. on August 10, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mougis Logistics Corp.(a Delaware corporation, )..(Haspel, Joseph)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Mougis Logistics Corp.(a Delaware corporation, ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Amended Complaint).(Haspel, Joseph)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Mougis Logistics Corp.(a Delaware corporation, )..(Haspel, Joseph)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Dkt. No. 6. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/9/2021) (kv)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Joseph Haspel dated 08/06/2021 re: Alfonso v. Mougis Logistics - withdrawal of motion to dismiss as moot. Document filed by Mougis Logistics Corp.(a Delaware corporation, )..(Haspel, Joseph)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mougis Logistics Corp. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Donald Alfonso. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Klein, Nolan)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nolan Keith Klein re: Document No. #12 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Mougis Logistics Corp. must be added to the docket again with party text 'a Delaware corporation'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Mougis Logistics Corp. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Donald Alfonso. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Klein, Nolan)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Nolan Klein, Esq. dated July 28, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Nolan Klein, Esq. dated July 28, 2021. Document filed by Donald Alfonso..(Klein, Nolan)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on August 24, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 8/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/20/2021) (va)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support with Exhibit served on Donald Alfonso c/o Nolan Klein Esq. on July 14, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mougis Logistics Corp...(Haspel, Joseph)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Mougis Logistics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A complaint).(Haspel, Joseph)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Mougis Logistics Corp...(Haspel, Joseph)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Mougis Logistics Corp. served on 6/26/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Service was accepted by James Mougis, Son of Andrew Mougis. Document filed by Donald Alfonso..(Klein, Nolan)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mougis Logistics Corp...(jgo)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nolan Keith Klein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Rockland;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Klein, Nolan)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mougis Logistics Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Donald Alfonso..(Klein, Nolan)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mougis Logistics Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24678512)Document filed by Donald Alfonso..(Klein, Nolan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfonso v. Mougis Logistics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Alfonso
Represented By: Nolan Keith Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mougis Logistics Corp.
Represented By: Joseph J Haspel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?