Alfonso et al v. 384 3rd Ave Rest LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso
Defendant: 384 3rd Ave Rest LLC d/b/a Tara Rose and Kevin Doherty
Case Number: 1:2021cv05316
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/21/2021) (nb)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by October 14, 2021, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by October 14, 2021, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/21/2021) (nb)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by October 14, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (As further set forth herein). (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/21/2021) (nb)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 384 3rd Ave Rest LLC, Kevin Doherty..(pc)
June 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Patrick Peter O'Donnell on behalf of Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso(Individually), Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso(On behalf of all others similarly situated)..(O'Donnell, James)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 384 3rd Ave Rest LLC; Kevin Doherty, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso(Individually), Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso(On behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Avshalumov, Roman)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso(Individually), Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso(On behalf of all others similarly situated). (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24681856)Document filed by Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso(Individually), Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso(On behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Avshalumov, Roman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfonso et al v. 384 3rd Ave Rest LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 384 3rd Ave Rest LLC d/b/a Tara Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhonatan Martinez Alfonso
Represented By: Roman Mikhail Avshalumov
Represented By: James Patrick Peter O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?