One Step Up, Ltd. v. Empire Apparel LLC et al
Defendant: Empire Apparel LLC, Assaf Cohen and Stephanie Goldman
Counter Defendant: One Step Up, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05392
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Referring Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
2 Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DATES granting #66 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court's Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Discovery and Related Deadlines, dated June 2, 2023 under Docket No. 63, and Order granting the Letter Motion to Continue the Deposition Completion Date, dated August 3, 2023 under Docket No. 65, is hereby modified as follows: Deposition due by 11/7/2023. Fact Discovery Cut-Off December 4, 2023. No further extensions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 8/21/2023) (mml)
August 21, 2023 Filing 66 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Fact Discovery) addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Yvette Sutton dated August 21,2023. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Discovery).(Sutton, Yvette)
August 21, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 12/4/2023. (mml)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 8/17/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 8/3/2023) (mml)
August 3, 2023 Filing 64 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Depositions addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Yvette Sutton dated August 3, 2023. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Sutton, Yvette)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DATES granting #62 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court's Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Discovery and Related Dates dated April 20, 2023 under Docket No. 61 is hereby modified as follows: Deposition due by 8/15/2023. Fact Discovery Cut-Off 9/18/2023. Expert Discovery Cut-Off 12/4/2023. No further extensions absent compelling circumstances. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 6/2/2023) (mml)
June 2, 2023 Filing 62 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Scott D. Simon dated June 2, 2023. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC, Stephanie Goldman..(Simon, Scott)
June 2, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 12/4/2023. Fact Discovery due by 9/18/2023. (mml)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DATES granting #60 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ON THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES AND FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Court's Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Discovery and Related Deadlines, dated October 13, 2022 under Docket No. 55, is hereby modified as follows. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 4/20/2023) (ate)
April 20, 2023 Filing 60 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Scott D. Simon dated April 20, 2023. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC, Stephanie Goldman..(Simon, Scott)
April 20, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deposition due by 6/15/2023. Expert Discovery due by 10/2/2023. Fact Discovery due by 7/17/2023. (ate)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DATES granting #58 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ON THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES AND FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Court's Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Discovery and Related Deadlines, dated January 6, 2023 under Docket No. 57, is hereby modified as follows: As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. The Court is granting the requested extension. The parties are cautioned, however, that future extensions may be less forthcoming. Deposition due by 5/15/2023.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/8/2023) (tg)
March 8, 2023 Filing 58 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Yvette Sutton dated March 8, 2023. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Discovery).(Sutton, Yvette)
March 8, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2023. Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2023. (tg)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DATES granting #56 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court's Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Discovery and Related Deadlines, dated October 13, 2022 under Docket No. 55, is hereby modified as follows: Deposition Completion Date: Current Date: January 13, 2023. Proposed Date: March 15, 2023. Fact Discovery Cut-off: Current Date: February 15, 2023. Proposed Date: March 15, 2023. Meet and Confer re: expert disclosures: Current Date: January 13, 2023. Proposed Date: March 1, 2023. Initial Expert Disclosures Cut-Off: Current Date: March 15, 2023. Proposed Date: April 14, 2023. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Cut-Off: Current Date: April 17, 2023. Proposed Date: May 17, 2023. Expert Discovery Cut-off: Current Date: May 17, 2023. Proposed Date: June 16, 2023. Deadline to submit pre-motion letter to the Court regarding summary judgment motion(s): Current Date: May 25, 2023. Proposed Date: June 30, 2023. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 3/15/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 1/6/2023) (tg)
January 6, 2023 Filing 56 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Yvette Sutton dated January 6, 2023. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Discovery).(Sutton, Yvette)
January 6, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 6/16/2023. Fact Discovery due by 3/15/2023. (tg)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DATES granting #54 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court's Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Discovery and Related Deadlines, dated July 1, 2022 under Docket No. 48, is hereby modified as follows: Deposition due by 1/13/2023. Fact Discovery Cut-Off 2/15/2023. Expert Discovery Cut-Off 5/17/2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/13/2022) (mml)
October 13, 2022 Filing 54 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Yvette J Sutton dated October 13, 2022. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Discovery).(Sutton, Yvette)
October 13, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 5/17/2023. Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2023. (mml)
October 3, 2022 Filing 53 ANSWER to #52 Counterclaim. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Sutton, Yvette)
September 23, 2022 Filing 52 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against One Step Up, Ltd.. Document filed by Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
September 23, 2022 Filing 51 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Stephanie Goldman..(Flanagan, Sean)
September 23, 2022 Filing 50 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Assaf Cohen..(Flanagan, Sean)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT & RECOMMENDATION on #41 Report and Recommendations for #27 Motion to Amend/Correct, Motion to Add Party(ies) filed by One Step Up, Ltd., #26 Motion for Leave to File Document filed by Empire Apparel LLC, Assaf Cohen, #25 Motion for Leave to File Document filed by Empire Apparel LLC, Assaf Cohen. The Court has reviewed the Report & Recommendation in its entirety, along with all relevant supporting documents, and finds that the Report & Recommendation is "thorough, well-reasoned, and free of any clear error." Skyrocket, LLC v. Comeyun, No. 19-cv-11623 (PGG) (RWL), 2022 WL 2712852, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. July 13, 2022). Finding no clear error, the Court ADOPTS the Report & Recommendation in full. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 25, 26, and 27. ( As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/9/2022) (vfr)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND RELATED DEADLINES: ON THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES AND FOR GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Court's Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, dated March 29, 2022 under Docket No. 40, is hereby modified as follows: Deposition due by 10/4/2022., Expert Discovery due by 12/14/2022., Fact Discovery due by 10/20/2022. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 7/01/2022) (ama) Modified on 7/7/2022 (ama).
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ESI STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the Plaintiff and Defendants that whereas no Party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a Party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the following constitutes the final agreement between the Parties as to all matters concerning electronic discovery: As set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 7/01/2022) (ama)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: granting #45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #45 Letter Motion for Discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 7/01/2022) (ama)
July 1, 2022 Filing 45 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Yvette J. Sutton dated July 1, 2022., LETTER MOTION for Discovery approve ESI stipulation addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Yvette J. Sutton dated July 1, 2022. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ESI Stipulation, #2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Extension).(Sutton, Yvette)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: granting #43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/28/2022) (ama)
April 28, 2022 Filing 43 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Sean R. Flanagan dated April 28, 2022. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
April 28, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/23/2022 (ama)
April 14, 2022 Filing 42 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC, Stephanie Goldman with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- TM Registration, #2 Exhibit B- Bushwich Supply TSDR, #3 Exhibit C- Bushwick Supply Office Action, #4 Exhibit D- Linkedin, #5 Exhibit E- Sample Garments, #6 Exhibit F- RN Database, #7 Exhibit G- Purchase Orders).(Lazarus, Harlan)
April 13, 2022 Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO HON. PAUL A. CROTTY: MOTIONS TO AMEND re: #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint, MOTION to Add Party(ies) Stephanie Goldman filed by One Step Up, Ltd., #26 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Empire Apparel LLC, Assaf Cohen, #25 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint filed by Empire Apparel LLC, Assaf Cohen. For the foregoing reasons, I recommend that the Court GRANT Plaintiffs motion to amend the complaint and DENY Defendants motion to amend their answer to assert third-party claims. Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 4/13/2022) (mml)
April 6, 2022 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Alison J. Nathan is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLANT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to a trial before a Magistrate Judge at this time. This case is to be tried to a jury. Deposition due by 8/1/2022. Fact Discovery due by 8/15/2022. Expert Discovery due by 10/14/2022. The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 3-4 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/29/2022) (ks)
March 29, 2022 Filing 39 LETTER MOTION to Continue Pretrial Schedule addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Yvette J. Sutton dated March 29, 2022. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Sutton, Yvette)
March 16, 2022 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Abraham Sultan in Support re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support., #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. MOTION to Add Party(ies) Stephanie Goldman .. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- screenshots from putty system, #2 Exhibit 2- email, #3 Exhibit 2- NYS Court Complaint).(Sutton, Yvette)
March 16, 2022 Filing 37 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. MOTION to Add Party(ies) Stephanie Goldman ., #26 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support. . Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Sutton, Yvette)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: March 17, 2022, Plaintiff shall file a sur-reply of no more than five pages regarding the cross-motions to amend. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger) (Text Only Order) (rsh).
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/3/2022) (vfr)
March 2, 2022 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Stephanie Goldman in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. MOTION to Add Party(ies) Stephanie Goldman .. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
March 2, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint . and in Opposition re: #27 to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Answer. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/17/2022) (vfr)
February 18, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/2/2022 Replies due by 3/16/2022. (vfr)
February 17, 2022 Filing 31 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for parties to respond to motions to amend [Dkt. Nos. 25 and 27] and adjournment of return dates to March 16, 2022 addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Sean R. Flanagan dated February 17, 2022. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
February 16, 2022 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Harlan M. Lazarus, Esq in Opposition re: #26 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support., #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. MOTION to Add Party(ies) Stephanie Goldman .. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Email correspondence, #2 Exhibit 2- trademark filing, #3 Exhibit 3- Invoice, #4 Exhibit 4- OSU Check, #5 Exhibit 5- Proposed Amended Complaint with Exhibits, #6 Exhibit 6- Redlined comparison).(Lazarus, Harlan)
February 16, 2022 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Abraham Sultan in Support re: #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. MOTION to Add Party(ies) Stephanie Goldman .. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan)
February 16, 2022 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. MOTION to Add Party(ies) Stephanie Goldman ., #26 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support. . Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan)
February 16, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint., MOTION to Add Party(ies) Stephanie Goldman .( Return Date set for 3/9/2022 at 09:30 AM.) Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan)
January 26, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
January 26, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Third Party Complaint . Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC. Return Date set for 2/23/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Sean R. Flanagan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Flanagan Declaraion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Flanagan Declaration, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Assaf Cohen, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Cohen Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Cohen Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Cohen Declaration).(Flanagan, Sean)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed 11/15/2021. All fact discovery is to be completed no later than 4/15/22. Depositions shall be completed by 4/1/22. All expert discovery, including disclosure of expert reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by 5/15/22. The parties shall be ready for trial within two weeks of filing the Joint Pretrial Report. This case is to be tried to a jury. SO ORDERED. Depositions due by 5/15/2022. Fact Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Expert Discovery due by 5/15/2022. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/12/2022) (vfr)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The Court GRANTS the requested extension. The Court will enter the revised case management plan and reschedule the post-discovery conference by separate order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/28/2021) (vfr)
December 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Depositions due by 4/1/2022. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Expert Discovery due by 5/15/2022. (vfr)
December 27, 2021 Filing 22 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Sean R. Flanagan dated December 27, 2021. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Scheduling Order).(Flanagan, Sean)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties shall be ready for trial within two weeks of the filing of the Joint Pretrial Report. This case is to be tried to a jury. SO ORDERED. Depositions shall be completed by 2/15/22. All expert discovery, including disclosure of expert reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions shall be completed by 4/15/22. Motions due by 11/15/2021. Deposition due by 4/15/2022. Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2022 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/28/2021) (vfr)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #19 Proposed Case Management Plan filed by One Step Up, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: The Court GRANTS the request to adjourn the initial pretrial conference sine die. The Court will enter the parties' case management plan by separate order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/28/2021) (ks)
September 24, 2021 Filing 19 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Letter).(Lazarus, Harlan)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: In light of the COVID-19 public health crisis, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrial conference in this case in person. Per the Court's notice of initial pretrial conference, the parties shall submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter no later than seven days prior to the scheduled conference. In the joint letter, the parties should advise the Court if they can do without a conference altogether. If so, the Court may enter a case management plan and scheduling order and the parties need not appear. If not, the Court will hold the initial pretrial conference by telephone. The parties and members of the public may access the proceeding by dialing (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 919-6964. In either case, counsel should review and comply with the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-alison-j-nathan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/17/2021) (vfr)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
August 19, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
July 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yvette Janelle Sutton on behalf of One Step Up, Ltd...(Sutton, Yvette)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Sean R. Flanagan dated July 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. Assaf Cohen answer due 8/20/2021; Empire Apparel LLC answer due 8/20/2021. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/19/2021) (mml)
July 19, 2021 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Sean R. Flanagan dated July 19, 2021. Document filed by Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC..(Flanagan, Sean)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Empire Apparel LLC served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. Service was accepted by Gina Sanchez. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Assaf Cohen served on 7/2/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. Service was accepted by Gina Sanchez. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/29/2021) (vfr)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lazarus, Harlan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Empire Apparel LLC. (sj)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Assaf Cohen. (sj)
June 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
June 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
June 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Harlan Mitchell Lazarus. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:0044; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1114; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
June 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Harlan Mitchell Lazarus to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
June 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Empire Apparel LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Assaf Cohen, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lazarus, Harlan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd...(Lazarus, Harlan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Assaf Cohen, Empire Apparel LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24691172)Document filed by One Step Up, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit Defendant's trademark status, #3 Exhibit USPTO Office Action concerning Bushwick Supply, #4 Exhibit Linkedin profile, #5 Exhibit Images of Infringing Goods, #6 Exhibit RN lookup).(Lazarus, Harlan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Step Up, Ltd. v. Empire Apparel LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: One Step Up, Ltd.
Represented By: Harlan Mitchell Lazarus
Represented By: Yvette Janelle Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Apparel LLC
Represented By: Sean Richard Flanagan
Represented By: Scott David Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assaf Cohen
Represented By: Sean Richard Flanagan
Represented By: Scott David Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Goldman
Represented By: Sean Richard Flanagan
Represented By: Scott David Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?