Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc. v. Dash
Plaintiff: Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc.
Defendant: Damon Dash and GoDigital Records, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv05411
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint served on GODIGITAL RECORDS, LLC on 08/11/2021. Service was accepted by Sagar Parikh, Registered Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
August 12, 2021 Filing 52 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Damon Dash, GoDigital Records, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Spiro, Alexander)
August 10, 2021 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GoDigital Records, LLC. (sj)
August 9, 2021 Filing 50 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GODIGITAL RECORDS, LLC, re: #47 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alexander Benjamin Spiro to RE-FILE Document No. #49 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the 'as to' docket entry text does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption; remove alias from party name;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 6, 2021 Filing 49 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GoDigital Records, LLC, d/b/a/ AdShare, re: #47 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander) Modified on 8/9/2021 (jgo).
August 6, 2021 Filing 48 ANSWER to #32 Counterclaim. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
August 6, 2021 Filing 47 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - (SEE #52) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Damon Dash, GoDigital Records, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Spiro, Alexander) Modified on 8/12/2021 (kj).
July 29, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Telephone Conference held on July 29, 2021. (Court Reporter Tabitha Dente). (mhe)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...Requests to seal shall be made in accordance with 4.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. If the motion to compel includes information that the opposing party has requested be sealed or redacted, the opposing party shall file a letter explaining the need to seal or redact the motion before the motion is filed. (And as further set forth herein.) IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/29/2021) (jca)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ESI PLAN AND ORDER: The parties in this action stipulate and agree that the following ESI Plan and Order shall govern the preservation, collection, and production of electronically stored information and documents in this action. The preceding constitutes the agreement(s) reached between the parties to certain matters concerning electronic discovery as of this date. Counsel certify that in connection with preparation of this ESI Plan and Order they are sufficiently knowledgeable in matters relating to their clients' technological systems to discuss competently issues relating to electronic discovery, or have involved someone competent to address these issues on their behalf. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/29/2021) (jca)
July 27, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/16/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 27, 2021 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/16/2021 before Judge John P. Cronan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sadie Herbert, (212) 805-0310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled For July 28, 2021. The conference scheduled for July 28, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. is adjourned to July 29, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/27/2021) (jca)
July 26, 2021 Filing 41 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled For July 28, 2021 addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Natraj Bhushan dated July 26, 2021. Document filed by Damon Dash..(Bhushan, Natraj)
July 23, 2021 Filing 40 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
July 23, 2021 Filing 39 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
July 22, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 7/1/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 22, 2021 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 7/1/2021 before Judge John P. Cronan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Franko, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Court will hold an initial pretrial conference on July 28, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The conference shall take place via telephone. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Initial Conference set for 7/28/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/18/2021) (cf)
July 16, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Telephone Conference held on July 16, 2021. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants request for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, Dkt. 33, is denied. Defendants motion to disqualify counsel, Dkt. 16, is denied without prejudice. (Court reporter Sadie Herbert). (mhe) Modified on 7/19/2021 (mhe).
July 16, 2021 Filing 35 OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc. from holding shareholder meeting today. . Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The Court will hold a conference to address Defendant's emergency motion for a temporary restraining order, Dkt. 33, on July 16, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. The conference shall take place via telephone. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. If Plaintiff would like to respond to Defendants motion in writing, it should do so by 3:00 p.m. today. In the alternative, the Court will also welcome Plaintiffs response at the conference. ( Responses due by 7/16/2021, Telephone Conference set for 7/16/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/16/2021) (cf)
July 16, 2021 Filing 33 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc. from holding shareholder meeting today. Document filed by Damon Dash. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Incorporation, #3 Exhibit Proposed Bylaws, #4 Exhibit Answer with Counterclaims, #5 Exhibit Memorandum of Law).(Bhushan, Natraj) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
July 16, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc.. Document filed by Damon Dash..(Bhushan, Natraj)
July 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Document No. #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Settlement discussions have not taken place. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their best estimate of the length of trial is 3-5 days. Motions due by 8/4/2021. Deposition due by 12/17/2021. Fact Discovery due by 11/2/2021. Expert Discovery due by 12/17/2021. Discovery due by 12/17/2021. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/12/2021) (nb)
July 12, 2021 Filing 30 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
July 12, 2021 Filing 29 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alex Spiro dated July 12, 2021 re: Joint Rule 26(f) Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan/Scheduling Order. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
July 2, 2021 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alex Spiro dated July 2, 2021 re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pending a final resolution of this action, Dash, all those in active concert with him, and all persons having notice of this Order by personal service or otherwise, be and the same hereby are RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from altering in any way, selling, assigning, pledging, encumbering, contracting with regard to, or in any way disposing of any property interest in Reasonable Doubt, including its copyright and including through any means, such as auctioning a non-fungible token (NFT) reflecting, referring, or directing to such interest; provided, however, that nothing in this Order shall prevent Dash from selling, assigning, pledging, encumbering, contracting with regard to, or in any way disposing of his one-third (1/3rd) ownership interest in RAF, Inc. to the extent it may otherwise be transferred in compliance with applicable laws. Nothing in this Order shall constitute a waiver of any claims, defenses, or remedies that either of the Parties may have. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/1/2021) (nb)
July 1, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Show cause hearing held on July 1, 2021. The TRO entered on June 22, 2021 is extended for good cause until July 2, 2021. By 5:00 p.m. on July 1, 2021, the parties shall file proposed language for the proposed preliminary injunction order. The parties shall use best efforts to submit a joint proposal. (Court Reporter Lisa Franko) (mhe)
July 1, 2021 Filing 26 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER The hearing is scheduled to take place on July 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12D of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The Court understands that Plaintiffs lead counsel will be traveling and out of town that day. Dkt. 21. If Plaintiffs lead counsel will be out of the Tri-state area and unable to attend the hearing, Plaintiff may file a letter explaining so and requesting that the Court hold the conference telephonically. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at Docket Numbers 17 and 21. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 06/29/2021) (mhe)
June 29, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alex Spiro dated June 29, 2021 re: Request to Cancel the Preliminary Injunction Hearing in Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc. v. Damon Dash. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 29, 2021 Filing 23 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Natraj Bhushan dated June 29, 2021 re: Letter Response to Court's June 29, 2021 Order and Plaintiff's Letter Motions. Document filed by Damon Dash..(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER By 12:00 p.m. on June 30, 2021, Defendant shall file a letter-response to Plaintiffs requests to adjourn the show cause hearing scheduled for July 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. See Dkts. 17, 21. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 06/29/2021) (mhe)
June 29, 2021 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Conference (Request that the Court Hold the Preliminary Injunction Hearing Telephonically if it Does Not Cancel the Hearing) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alex Spiro dated June 29, 2021. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Jordan W. Siev in Opposition re: #16 FIRST MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #16 FIRST MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . (Consolidated Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Counsel). Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER The show cause hearing scheduled for July 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. will be held in person in Courtroom 12D of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 06/28/2021) (mhe)
June 28, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Request to Cancel the Preliminary Injunction Hearing) addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Alex Spiro dated June 28, 2021. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John P. Cronan. (mhe)
June 25, 2021 Filing 16 FIRST MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Document filed by Damon Dash. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Opposition to Plaintiff's OSC and in Support of Cross-Motion, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Memorandum of Law In Opposition to OSC and In Support of Cross-Motion).(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natraj Bhushan on behalf of Damon Dash..(Bhushan, Natraj)
June 22, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Cronan: Telephone Conference held on June 22, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. For the reasons set forth on the record, the Court will enter the proposed order to show cause and temporary restraining order. Order to show cause hearing set for July 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants opposition shall be submitted by June 25, 2021 and any reply shall be filed by June 29, 2021. (Court Reporter Michael McDaniel). (mhe)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: Upon the Complaint dated June 18, 2021, the Memorandum of Law dated June 18, 2021, and the Declaration of Shawn Carter a/k/a Jay-Z dated June 18, 2021, Defendant is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE before a motion term of this Court, on the 1st day of July, 2021, at 10 o'clock in the a.m. of that day, or as soon as the parties to this proceeding may be heard why an Order should not be issued under Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining Defendant from altering in any way, selling, assigning, pledging, encumbering, contracting with regard to, or in any way disposing of any property interest in Reasonable Doubt, including its copyright and including through any means, such as auctioning a non-fungible token (NFT) reflecting such interests, pending a final determination of the above-captioned lawsuit. The hearing scheduled for July 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. shall take place via teleconference. At the scheduled time, all parties shall call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Sufficient reason appearing therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that, pending a determination on Plaintiff's Order to Show Cause, Defendant, all those in active concert with him, and all persons having notice of this Order by personal service or otherwise, be and the same hereby are RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from altering in any way, selling, assigning, pledging, encumbering, contracting with regard to, or in any way disposing of any property interest in Reasonable Doubt, including its copyright and including through any means, such as auctioning a non-fungible token (NFT) reflecting such interests. Sufficient reason appearing therefore, let service of a copy of this Order and a copy of the papers on which it is granted be made upon Defendant's attorneys by the 23rd day of June 2021, be deemed good and sufficient service. Defendant shall have until the 25th day of June, 2021, to file and deliver answering papers to the attorneys for Plaintiff, and Plaintiff shall have until the 29th day of June, 2021, to file and deliver reply papers to the attorneys for Defendant., (Responses due by 6/25/2021, Replies due by 6/29/2021., Telephone Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/22/2021) (nb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luke William Nikas on behalf of Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Nikas, Luke)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The conference scheduled for June 21, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. is adjourned to June 22, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. At the scheduled time, counsel for Plaintiff and any other parties should call (866) 434-5269, code 9176261. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on any currently known counsel for Defendant by June 21, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/21/2021) (mhe)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc.'s proposed order to show cause with emergency relief, Dkt. 5, memorandum of law in support of Plaintiff's proposed order, Dkt. 6, and the Declaration of Shawn Carter a/k/a Jay-Z in support of Plaintiff's proposed order, Dkt. 7. Plaintiff requests an order to show cause, preliminary injunction, and temporary restraining order against Defendant Damon Dash. The Court will hold a conference to address these requests on June 21, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. At the scheduled time, counsel for Plaintiff and any other parties should call (866) 434-5269, code 9176261. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on any currently known counsel for Defendant by June 21, 2021 at 1:00 p.m., (Telephone Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 6/21/2021) (nb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Damon Dash. (vf)
June 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
June 21, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/22/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (mhe)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Brian Maslo on behalf of Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Maslo, Paul)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #13) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luke William Nikas on behalf of Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Nikas, Luke) Modified on 6/22/2021 (ldi).
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Shawn Carter a/k/a Jay-Z in Support re: #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 18, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief . Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 18, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 18, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Damon Dash, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Spiro, Alexander)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Damon Dash. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24692137)Document filed by Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc...(Spiro, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc. v. Dash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Dash
Represented By: Natraj Bhushan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDigital Records, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roc-A-Fella Records, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Benjamin Spiro
Represented By: Luke William Nikas
Represented By: Paul Brian Maslo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?