Ultria, Inc. v. New York Times Company
Plaintiff: Ultria, Inc.
Defendant: New York Times Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv05507
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Ultria, Inc.. Document filed by New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by August 23, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth in this order. If this case has been settled or otherwise terminated, counsel are required to notify the Court - before the deadline for the above submissions - by calling (212) 805-0292 and must e-mail a stipulation of discontinuance, voluntary dismissal, or other proof of termination to the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov). SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2021) (ate)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by August 23, 2021, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by August 23, 2021, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2021) (ate)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER It is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28 if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2021) (ate)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above-captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that Defendant has accepted service of the Complaint in the above matter and that Defendant shall have until July 30, 2021, to answer, move or otherwise respond. SO ORDERED. New York Times Company answer due 7/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/12/2021) (ate)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by New York Times Company..(Sumar, Al-Amyn)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Al-Amyn Shiraz Sumar on behalf of New York Times Company..(Sumar, Al-Amyn)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Edward McCraw on behalf of New York Times Company..(McCraw, David)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faul, Michael)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against New York Times Company. Document filed by Ultria, Inc...(Faul, Michael)
June 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Michael J. Faul, Jr. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
June 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael J. Faul, Jr. to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
June 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael J. Faul, Jr.. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code New York; Fee Status code pend (IFP pending). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
June 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 24, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 24, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24711838)Document filed by Ultria, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Faul, Michael) Modified on 6/24/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ultria, Inc. v. New York Times Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultria, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Faul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Times Company
Represented By: Al-Amyn Shiraz Sumar
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?