Ramirez Gil et al v. 367 Bake Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Pedro M. Ramirez Gil, Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez, Patricio Ramos Garcia and Rene Padilla Valdez
Defendant: Kamal Khadir, 367 Bake Corp. doing business as Tasty Catering, 126 Bake Corp. doing business as Tasty Cafe, Samy El Fouly and Kenny
Case Number: 1:2021cv05574
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 367 Bake Corp. served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized agent. Document filed by Rene Padilla Valdez(and on behalf of others similarly situated); Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(individually); Patricio Ramos Garcia(individually); Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(and on behalf of others similarly situated); Patricio Ramos Garcia(and on behalf of others similarly situated); Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(and on behalf of others similarly situated); Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(individually); Rene Padilla Valdez (individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 126 Bake Corp. served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized agent. Document filed by Rene Padilla Valdez(and on behalf of others similarly situated); Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(individually); Patricio Ramos Garcia(individually); Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(and on behalf of others similarly situated); Patricio Ramos Garcia(and on behalf of others similarly situated); Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(and on behalf of others similarly situated); Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(individually); Rene Padilla Valdez (individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catalina Sojo on behalf of Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(individually), Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez (individually), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Sojo, Catalina)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samy El Fouly. (vf)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kamal Khadir. (vf)
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 367 Bake Corp. (vf)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 126 Bake Corp. (vf)
June 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 28, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 28, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samy El Fouly, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(individually), Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez (individually), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kamal Khadir a.k.a. Kenny, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(individually), Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez (individually), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 367 Bake Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(individually), Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez (individually), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 126 Bake Corp., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(individually), Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Rene Padilla Valdez (individually), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(and on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 126 Bake Corp., 367 Bake Corp., Samy El Fouly, Kamal Khadir. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24722293)Document filed by Rene Padilla Valdez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(individually), Patricio Ramos Garcia(individually), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Patricio Ramos Garcia(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Pedro M. Ramirez Gil(individually), Rene Padilla Valdez (individually)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez Gil et al v. 367 Bake Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamal Khadir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 367 Bake Corp. doing business as Tasty Catering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 126 Bake Corp. doing business as Tasty Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samy El Fouly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro M. Ramirez Gil
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Catalina Sojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Adrian Cruz Lopez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Catalina Sojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricio Ramos Garcia
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Catalina Sojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Padilla Valdez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Catalina Sojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?