McCormack v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Regan McCormack
Defendant: Moynihan Station Development Corporation and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv05597
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The conference scheduled for September 2, 2021, is hereby ADJOURNED to September 15, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to close ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/24/2021) (rro)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for September 2, 2021 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Michael Armienti dated 8/23/2021. Document filed by Moynihan Station Development Corporation, National Railroad Passenger Corporation..(Armienti, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Counsel are reminded that they must submit a proposed case management plan and joint letter by the Thursday prior to the upcoming conference, as directed in the Court's earlier Scheduling Order. In their joint letter, the parties should also indicate whether they believe they can do without an initial conference altogether. If so, the Court may enter a case management plan and scheduling order, in which case the parties would not need to appear. Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, however, the conference remains in effect and will be held in person in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY. (If counsel believe that the conference should be held by telephone, they should in accordance with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices promptly file a letter motion to that effect. Any such letter motion should indicate other dates and times during the week of the conference when counsel would be available.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/23/2021) (va)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph J Kazmierczuk on behalf of Regan McCormack..(Kazmierczuk, Joseph)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 2, 2021 at 3:45 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 2.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/2/21) (yv)
July 2, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Memorandum to Clerk re: Notice of Filing Removal in State Court re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Moynihan Station Development Corporation, National Railroad Passenger Corporation..(Armienti, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 29, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
June 29, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Armienti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
June 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Armienti on behalf of Moynihan Station Development Corporation, National Railroad Passenger Corporation..(Armienti, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Moynihan Station Development Corporation, National Railroad Passenger Corporation..(Armienti, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Armienti, Michael)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 154850/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24726244).Document filed by Moynihan Station Development Corporation, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Answer).(Armienti, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormack v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moynihan Station Development Corporation
Represented By: Michael Armienti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Michael Armienti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regan McCormack
Represented By: Joseph J Kazmierczuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?