Wallace v. Fundation Group LLC
Petitioner: Katie Maloney Wallace
Respondent: Fundation Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv05681
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joseph A. Matteo dated August 27, 2021 re: Wallace v. Fundation Group LLC, Civ. No. 21-cv-5681 (PGG). Document filed by Fundation Group LLC..(Matteo, Joseph)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Rosanne E. Felicello dated 07/12/2021 re: Opposition to premotion letter. Document filed by Katie Maloney Wallace..(Felicello, Rosanne)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibit 8 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Rosanne E. Felicello dated July 9, 2021. by Katie Maloney Wallace, Fundation Group LLC Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #7 .(Felicello, Rosanne)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibit 8 addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Rosanne E. Felicello dated July 9, 2021. Document filed by Katie Maloney Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 8 REDACTED).(Felicello, Rosanne)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joseph A. Matteo dated July 8, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Fundation Group LLC..(Matteo, Joseph)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Rosanne E. Felicello dated 7/8/2021 re: Exhibits to Petition. Document filed by Katie Maloney Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer to Arbitration Demand, #2 Exhibit 2 - JAMS Arbitration Transcript - Vol 1, #3 Exhibit 3 - JAMS Arbitration Transcript - Vol 2, #4 Exhibit 4 - JAMS Arbitration Transcript - Vol 3, #5 Exhibit 5 - Wallace Offer Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Murphy Offer Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 - 5/15/18 Email, #8 Exhibit 9 - 11/25/19 Email, #9 Exhibit 10 - Veterinary Go-To-Market Strategy and Deliverable Plan, #10 Exhibit 11 - Exhibitor and Sponsor List, #11 Exhibit 12 - Spreadsheet, #12 Exhibit 13 - 5/14/18 Email, #13 Exhibit 14 - 6/11/18 Email, #14 Exhibit 15 - Murphys Review, #15 Exhibit 16 - Chat between Wallace and Jagdmann, #16 Exhibit 17 - 1/7/19 Email, #17 Exhibit 18 - Fundation Annual Reflection 2018, #18 Exhibit 19 - Zalea Referral Agreement, #19 Exhibit 20 - Zalea Forecast, #20 Exhibit 21 - Fundation Employee Handbook (part 1), #21 Exhibit 21 - Fundation Employee Handbook (part 2), #22 Exhibit 22 - 5/18/18 Email, #23 Exhibit 23 - 2/5/19 Email, #24 Exhibit 24 - Excerpt from Wallace's Deposition Transcript, #25 Exhibit 25 - Graziano's Email with Organizational Chart, #26 Exhibit 26 - 3/23/19 Email, #27 Exhibit 27 - 2/21/19 Email, #28 Exhibit 28 - Pipeline Spreadsheet, #29 Exhibit 29 - 6/25/18 Email, #30 Exhibit 30 - 1/31/19 Email, #31 Exhibit 31 - 3/25/19 Email, #32 Exhibit 32 - 4/4/19 Email, #33 Exhibit 33 - 4/8/19 Email, #34 Exhibit 34 - 4/9/19 Email, #35 Exhibit 35 - Wallace's Arbitration Demand, #36 Exhibit 36 - Wallace's Amended Statement of Claim, #37 Exhibit 37 - Interim Order No. 1, #38 Exhibit 38 - Respondent's Partial Demurrer to Amended Statement of Claim, #39 Exhibit 39 - Arbitrators December 21, 2020 Order, #40 Exhibit 40 - Arbitration Award, #41 Exhibit 41 - Wallace's request to correct the arbitration award, #42 Exhibit 42 - Arbitrator's request for a further submission, #43 Exhibit 43 - Wallace's response to the Arbitrators request, #44 Exhibit 44 - Supplemental Arbitration Award).(Felicello, Rosanne)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rosanne Elena Felicello on behalf of Katie Maloney Wallace..(Felicello, Rosanne)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fundation Group LLC..(Matteo, Joseph)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Matteo, Joseph)
July 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 654044/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24740234).Document filed by Fundation Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Petition, #2 Exhibit B- Affirmation, #3 Exhibit C-Exhibits (Pending Sealed), #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Petition, #5 Exhibit E-Notice, #6 Exhibit F-Arbitration Award, #7 Exhibit G-Supplemental Award).(Matteo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Fundation Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fundation Group LLC
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Matteo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Katie Maloney Wallace
Represented By: Rosanne Elena Felicello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?