Bobcar Media, LLC v. Deutsche Telekom AG et al.
Plaintiff: Bobcar Media, LLC
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc., Deutsche Telekom AG doing business as T-Mobile, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05685
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/9/2021) (cf)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to T-Mobile USA, Inc...(pc)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deutsche Telekom AG..(pc)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(pc)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd...(pc)
July 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 1, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
July 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Morris E. Cohen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Deutsche Telekom AG, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Bobcar Media, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bobcar Media, LLC..(Cohen, Morris)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bobcar Media, LLC..(Cohen, Morris)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deutsche Telekom AG, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bobcar Media, LLC..(Cohen, Morris)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to T-Mobile USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Bobcar Media, LLC..(Cohen, Morris)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Cohen, Morris)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AHA Ventures LLC for Bobcar Media, LLC. Document filed by Bobcar Media, LLC..(Cohen, Morris)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cohen, Morris)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Telekom AG, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24740454)Document filed by Bobcar Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12).(Cohen, Morris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobcar Media, LLC v. Deutsche Telekom AG et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Telekom AG doing business as T-Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobcar Media, LLC
Represented By: Morris E. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?