Friel v. Dapper Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeeun Friel and John Austin
Defendant: Dapper Labs, Inc. and Roham Gharegozlou
Lead Plaintiff: Gary Leuis
Case Number: 1:2021cv05837
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECISION AND ORDER denying #37 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons discussed above, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion (Dkt. No. 37) of Dapper Labs Inc. and Roham Gharegozlou (together, "Defendants") to dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. Defendants are directed to Answer within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/22/2023) (jca)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc., Roham Gharegozlou..(Herzinger, Kenneth)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Austin, Gary Leuis..(Kim, Phillip)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DECLARATION of Erin Zatlin in Support re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Verge Article, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Sports Illustrated, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - New York Times, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Yahoo, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Leuis PSLRA, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Austin PSLRA, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - NBA Top Shot Terms of Service).(Zatlin, Erin)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Erin Zatlin to RE-FILE Document #36 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion.. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (Supporting Documents are found under the Event Type - Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents; Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion and Declaration in Support of Motion found under the Event List. Use Notice (Other) from the event list found under the event type Other Document. (kj)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Declaration of E. Zatlin In Support of Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Verge Article, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Sports Illustrated, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - New York Times, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Yahoo, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Leuis PSLRA, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Austin PSLRA, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - NBA Top Shot Terms of Service).(Zatlin, Erin) Modified on 8/31/2022 (kj).
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #34 Letter, filed by Dapper Labs, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule. The Defendants' motion to dismiss is due by August 30, 2022; the Plaintiffs' opposition is due by October 31, 2022; and the Defendants' reply is due by November 30, 2022. The Court modifies the parties' proposed pagination for their briefs. The memoranda of law in support of and in opposition to the motion shall not exceed 30 pages, and the reply in support of the motion shall not exceed 12 pages. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 8/30/2022., Responses due by 10/31/2022, Replies due by 11/30/2022.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/5/2022) (jca)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Kenneth P. Herzinger and Phillip Kim dated 07/01/2022 re: Your Honors June 24, 2022 Order (Dkt No. 33) directing the parties to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference (Dkt No. 32) is DENIED, and the parties are directed to submit to the Court, by July 1, 2022, a proposed briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/24/2022) (ama) (Main Document 33 replaced on 6/27/2022) (va).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Kenneth P. Herzinger dated February 22, 2022 re: pursuant to Section II.B.2 of Honorable Victor Marrero's Individual Practices requesting conference on proposed motion to dismiss. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - January 27, 2022 Letter from K. Herzinger to P. Kim, #2 Exhibit 2 - February 3, 2022 Letter from P. Kim to K. Herzinger).(Herzinger, Kenneth)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Phillip Kim dated 02/03/2022 re: Letter from Phillip Kim to Kenneth P. Herzinger dated 02/03/2022 pursuant to Section II.B.1 of the Honorable Victor Marrero's Individual Practices regarding Mr. Herzinger's 01/27/2022 letter. Document filed by John Austin, Gary Leuis..(Kim, Phillip)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Kenneth P. Herzinger dated 01/27/2022 re: Letter from Kenneth P. Herzinger to Phillip Kim dated 1/27/2022 pursuant to Section II.B.1 of the Honorable Victor Marrero's Individual Practices regarding proposed Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Roham Gharegozlou. (vf)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Roham Gharegozlou, re: #27 Amended Complaint. Document filed by John Austin, Gary Leuis..(Kim, Phillip)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dapper Labs, Inc., Roham Gharegozlou with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Gary Leuis, John Austin. (Attachments: #1 Austin PSLRA Certification).(Kim, Phillip)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #25 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and Respond to Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Phillip Kim and Kenneth P. Herzinger dated October 20, 2021. Request GRANTED. The scheduled is modified as requested above. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 12/27/2021.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/22/2021) (kv)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and Respond to Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Phillip Kim and Kenneth P. Herzinger dated October 20, 2021. Document filed by Gary Leuis..(Kim, Phillip)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alex Cohen on behalf of Gary Leuis..(Cohen, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVING LEAD PLAINTIFF'S SELECTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL Pursuant to Section 27 of the Securities Act of 1933, Movant is appointed as Lead Plaintiff for the class as it has the largest financial interest in this litigation and otherwise satisfies the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 23. Movant's choice of counsel is approved and accordingly, The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. is appointed as Lead Counsel. Lead Counsel, after being appointed by the Court, shall manage the prosecution of this litigation. Lead Counsel is to avoid duplicative or unproductive activities and is hereby vested by the Court with the responsibilities that include, without limitation, the following: to prepare all pleadings; to direct and coordinate the briefing and arguing of motions in accordance with the schedules set by the orders and rules of this Court; to initiate and direct discovery; prepare the case for trial; and to engage in settlement negotiations on behalf of Lead Plaintiff and the Class. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/8/2021) (js) Modified on 10/14/2021 (js).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #21 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Appoint Gary Leuis to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. . Document filed by Gary Leuis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume).(Kim, Phillip)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Gary Leuis. Related Document Number: #20 ..(Kim, Phillip) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Gary Leuis to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. Document filed by Gary Leuis..(Kim, Phillip)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ABIGAIL HEATHER WALD granting #15 Motion for Abigail Heather Wald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/1/2021) (rj)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SEAN DAVID UNGER granting #14 Motion for Sean David Unger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/1/2021) (rj)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ERIN LOUISE LEE ZATLIN granting #16 Motion for Erin Louise Lee Zatlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/1/2021) (rj)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Sean David Unger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24975119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #16 MOTION for Erin Louise Lee Zatlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24975262. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #15 MOTION for Abigail Heather Wald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24975202. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Erin Louise Lee Zatlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24975262. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Zatlin, Erin)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Abigail Heather Wald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24975202. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Wald, Abigail)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Sean David Unger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24975119. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Unger, Sean)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/15/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Letter Motion for Extension of Time served on Plaintiff Jeeun Friel on 08/11/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Zwillinger, Zachary)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff Jeeun Friel's Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Kenneth P. Herzinger dated 08/11/2021. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter Motion for Extension of Time served on Plaintiff Jeeun Friel on 07/13/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request GRANTED. Defendant's request for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint is hereby granted. Defendant's response is due August 13, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/13/2021) (ate)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Dapper Labs, Inc. answer due 8/13/2021. (ate)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff Jeeun Friel's Complaint addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Kenneth P. Herzinger dated 07/12/2021. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Zwillinger on behalf of Dapper Labs, Inc...(Zwillinger, Zachary)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Phillip Kim, Laurence M. Rosen, Michael Cohen on July 7, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653134/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24764855).Document filed by Dapper Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint).(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Patrick Herzinger on behalf of Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Patrick Herzinger on behalf of Dapper Labs, Inc...(Herzinger, Kenneth)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Herzinger, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friel v. Dapper Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeeun Friel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Austin
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dapper Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Herzinger
Represented By: Zachary Zwillinger
Represented By: Abigail Wald
Represented By: Sean D. Unger
Represented By: Erin Zatlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roham Gharegozlou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Gary Leuis
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Michael Alex Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?