Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv05841
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 jd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Marie Szczepanski on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut..(Szczepanski, Lisa)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Starr Indemnity & Liability Company served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. Service was accepted by Gary Castelli Authorized Agent. Document filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut..(Reid, Meg)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Starr Indemnity & Liability Company on 8/26/2021. Service was accepted by Gary Castelli Authorized Agent. Document filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut..(Reid, Meg)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/8/2021) (rro)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company..(pc)
July 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut..(Reid, Meg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reid, Meg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24764780)Document filed by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Subcontract, #2 Exhibit 2-Certificate of Insurance).(Reid, Meg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Represented By: Lisa Marie Szczepanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?