Rodriguez et al v. 3 Rivers Expedited Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Braulio E. Rodriguez, Fernando Hernandez and Attorney Ariel Niyazov
Defendant: 3 Rivers Expedited Inc. and Robert Anthony Smallwood
Case Number: 1:2021cv05843
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Telephone Conference held on 8/27/2021. (arc)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 9/27/2021. Deposition due by 2/7/2022. Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2021. Expert Discovery due by 2/7/2022. Discovery due by 2/7/2022. Status Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/27/2021) (rj)
August 25, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Lisa M Rolle dated 08/25/21 re: In response to court order. Document filed by 3 Rivers Expedited Inc., Robert Anthony Smallwood..(Rolle, Lisa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by 3 Rivers Expedited Inc., Robert Anthony Smallwood..(Rolle, Lisa)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: In anticipation of the conference scheduled for Friday, August 27 at 3:30 pm, it is hereby: ORDERED that, by August 26, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth in this order. FURTHER ORDERED that, by August 26, 2021, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-ronnie-abrams. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions, which were updated on April 1, 2020, and are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. Please consult my Individual Rules and Practices with respect to communications with Chambers and related matters. As stated in the Court's order dated July 9, 2021, the conference will be held remotely. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/23/2021) (js)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ariel Niyazov on behalf of Ariel Niyazov..(Niyazov, Ariel)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rolle, Lisa)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew H. Feinberg on behalf of 3 Rivers Expedited Inc., Robert Anthony Smallwood..(Feinberg, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that all parties or their counsel appear telephonically for an initial case management conference with the Court at 3:30 p.m. on August 27, 2021. If Plantiffs are proceeding pro se (without an attorney), they are required to appear personally at this conference. If Plaintiffs have retained an attorney, the attorney should attend the conference in Plaintiffs' place, although they are also welcome to attend. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. The Court would also like to inform Plaintiffs that free legal assistance may be available via the New York Legal Assistance Group ("NYLAG"), which is an independent free legal clinic. Plaintiffs can reach NYLAG by calling (212) 613-500 or emailing info@nylag.org. A copy of the Court's Special Rules & Practices in Civil Pro Se Cases is enclosed. Attorneys and unrepresented parties are directed to consult these rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other matters. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/9/2021) (rj) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lisa Marie Rolle to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pc)
July 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lisa Marie Rolle. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rolle, Lisa) Modified on 7/8/2021 (pc).
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151689/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24765059).Document filed by Robert Anthony Smallwood, 3 Rivers Expedited Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ad Damnum).(Rolle, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. 3 Rivers Expedited Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braulio E. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney Ariel Niyazov
Represented By: Ariel Niyazov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Rivers Expedited Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rolle
Represented By: Matthew H. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Anthony Smallwood
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rolle
Represented By: Matthew H. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?