Mosley v. Highbridge Community Development Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Davida Mosley
Defendant: Highbridge Community Development Corporation, Rodolfo Palacios, Hasou, Rudolph Paleti and Odeh Hasou
Case Number: 1:2021cv05876
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #8 Amended Complaint against Odeh Hasou, Highbridge Community Development Corporation, Rudolph Paleti with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Davida Mosley. Related document: #8 Amended Complaint..(Kleinman, Randy)
August 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Randy Edward Kleinman to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected. Do not select the All Defendant radio button. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (gp)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Davida Mosley..(Kleinman, Randy) Modified on 8/18/2021 (gp).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letters regarding Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss (see Dkt. Nos. 4 and 6), Plaintiff is directed to file any Amended Complaint by August 18, 2021. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 4, 2021 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/18/2021.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/28/2021) (vfr)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randy E, Kleinman dated July 22, 2021 re: Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference. Document filed by Davida Mosley..(Kleinman, Randy)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randy Edward Kleinman on behalf of Davida Mosley..(Kleinman, Randy)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Melissa Friedland dated July 15, 2021 re: Request for pre-motion conference. Document filed by Odeh Hasou, Highbridge Community Development Corporation, Rudolph Paleti..(Friedland, Melissa)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/12/2021) (nb)
July 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Melissa Jill Friedland to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; party name on the PDF case caption does not match as it appears on the pleading caption; multiple Nature of Suit codes were selected; Jury Demand code was not selected; Citizenship Plaintiff and Defendant codes must only be selected when Diversity Basis of Jurisdiction code is selected; the PDF was not dated;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Melissa Jill Friedland. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx;. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Melissa Jill Friedland. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Rodolfo Palacios; Hasou. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
July 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Friedland, Melissa) Modified on 7/9/2021 (jgo).
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of NY, County of Bronx. Case Number: 806996/2021E..Document filed by Hasou, Rodolfo Palacios, Highbridge Community Development Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Email between counsel dated July 6, 2021, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to the Clerk of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Notice to Adverse Party).(Friedland, Melissa)
July 8, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Notice of Removal,. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24770239..(Friedland, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Highbridge Community Development Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davida Mosley
Represented By: Randy Edward Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highbridge Community Development Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Jill Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo Palacios
Represented By: Melissa Jill Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasou
Represented By: Melissa Jill Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph Paleti
Represented By: Melissa Jill Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odeh Hasou
Represented By: Melissa Jill Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?