Mogul v. New York Public Radio et al
Plaintiff: Fred Mogul
Defendant: New York Public Radio, WNYC and Audrey Cooper
Case Number: 1:2021cv05882
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 lm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 25 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Cynthia Rollings dated September 3, 2021 re: #24 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Wendy C. Butler dated September 1, 2021. . Document filed by Fred Mogul..(Droubi, Luna)
September 1, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Wendy C. Butler dated September 1, 2021. Document filed by Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC..(Butler, Wendy)
August 24, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court or Opportunity to Amend and then Remand to Supreme Court. . Document filed by Fred Mogul..(Droubi, Luna)
August 24, 2021 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fred Mogul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's CV, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's WNYC Bio, #3 Exhibit C - Draft Story, #4 Exhibit D - Stand-Alone Comments, #5 Exhibit E - Published Story, #6 Exhibit F - AP Story, #7 Exhibit G - New York Times Article, #8 Exhibit H - Side by Side Comparisons of NYPR/WNYC Stories in which AP Copy Was Used in the Same Way It Appeared in Plaintiff's Draft, #9 Exhibit I - Side by Side Comparisons of Stories from Other Media Organizations).(Droubi, Luna)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request granted. All briefing on the motion to dismiss is stayed pending a decision on the motion to remand. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/19/2021) (mml)
August 16, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Wendy C. Butler in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court or Opportunity to Amend and then Remand to Supreme Court.. Document filed by Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement).(Butler, Wendy)
August 16, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court or Opportunity to Amend and then Remand to Supreme Court. . Document filed by Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC..(Butler, Wendy)
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Wendy C. Butler dated August 11, 2021. Document filed by Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC..(Butler, Wendy)
July 31, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Cynthia Rollings in Support re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court or Opportunity to Amend and then Remand to Supreme Court.. Document filed by Fred Mogul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons with Notice, dated May 5, 2021, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email string between Wendy Butler and Cynthia Rollings, dated May 12, 2021, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Service, dated May 13, 2021, #4 Exhibit 4 - Acknowledgement of Receipt of Service, dated June 8, 2021, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Appearance and Demand for Complaint, dated June 10, 2021, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs Complaint).(Droubi, Luna)
July 31, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court or Opportunity to Amend and then Remand to Supreme Court. . Document filed by Fred Mogul..(Droubi, Luna)
July 31, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court or Opportunity to Amend and then Remand to Supreme Court. Document filed by Fred Mogul..(Droubi, Luna)
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luna Droubi on behalf of Fred Mogul..(Droubi, Luna)
July 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Leigh Pattiz on behalf of Fred Mogul..(Pattiz, Rebecca)
July 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia Rollings on behalf of Fred Mogul..(Rollings, Cynthia)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Wendy C. Butler dated July 13, 2021., #1 Notice of Removal,. OK. Audrey Cooper answer due 8/24/2021; New York Public Radio answer due 8/24/2021; WNYC answer due 8/24/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/14/2021) (nb)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must participate in a telephone conference on 9/23/2021 at 10:00 a.m. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. Initial Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/14/2021) (nb)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter motion for extension of time with Ex A served on Fred Mogul on July 13, 2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC..(Butler, Wendy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Wendy C. Butler dated July 13, 2021. Document filed by Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Stipulation).(Butler, Wendy)
July 12, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-04972-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
July 12, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
July 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Related Case Statement, Notices of Appearance, and 7.1 Statement served on Fred Mogul on July 8, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC..(Martin, Justin)
July 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
July 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
July 9, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:21-cv-4972 (CM). (gp)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin David Martin on behalf of Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC..(Martin, Justin)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Public Radio..(Butler, Wendy)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy C. Butler on behalf of Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC..(Butler, Wendy)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-04972. Document filed by Audrey Cooper, New York Public Radio, WNYC..(Butler, Wendy)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Butler, Wendy)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 652968/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24770158).Document filed by Audrey Cooper, WNYC, New York Public Radio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons With Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Other Process).(Butler, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mogul v. New York Public Radio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Mogul
Represented By: Cynthia Rollings
Represented By: Luna Droubi
Represented By: Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Public Radio
Represented By: Justin David Martin
Represented By: Wendy C. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WNYC
Represented By: Justin David Martin
Represented By: Wendy C. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Cooper
Represented By: Justin David Martin
Represented By: Wendy C. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?