Niram, Inc. v. Sterling National Bank
Plaintiff: NIRAM, INC. and Niram, Inc.,
Defendant: Sterling National Bank
Case Number: 1:2021cv05966
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Ian T. Clarke-Fisher dated 09/03/2021. Granted. SO ORDERED. Sterling National Bank answer due 10/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/7/2021) (va)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward J. Heath on behalf of Sterling National Bank..(Heath, Edward)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Ian T. Clarke-Fisher dated 09/03/2021. Document filed by Sterling National Bank..(Clarke-Fisher, Ian)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian T. Clarke-Fisher on behalf of Sterling National Bank..(Clarke-Fisher, Ian)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sterling National Bank waiver sent on 7/13/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. Document filed by Niram, Inc.,..(Matteo, Joseph)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Matteo, Joseph)
July 13, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joseph Andrew Matteo. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Andrew Matteo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NIRAM, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
July 13, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 13, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by NIRAM, INC...(Matteo, Joseph)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sterling National Bank. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24782466)Document filed by NIRAM, INC...(Matteo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niram, Inc. v. Sterling National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIRAM, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Matteo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niram, Inc.,
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Matteo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling National Bank
Represented By: Edward J. Heath
Represented By: Ian T. Clarke-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?