Blakely v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Plaintiff: Alisia Blakely
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Case Number: 1:2021cv05979
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Alan Muraidekh dated August 24, 2021 re: joint letter to court concerning no magistrate. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/18/2021) (cf)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MTA Metro-North Railroad..(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: his case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties participate in an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time listed below. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN October 11, 2021. DATE AND TIME OF CONFERENCE: October 18, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial- in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/15/2021) (js)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barkan, Steven)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MTA Metro-North Railroad..(jgo)
July 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Steven Laurence Barkan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Origin code was not selected; Basis of Jurisdiction code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Laurence Barkan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alisia Blakely. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Laurence Barkan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jgo)
July 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MTA Metro-North Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alisia Blakely..(Barkan, Steven)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barkan, Steven) Modified on 7/14/2021 (jgo).
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTA Metro-North Railroad. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24784401)Document filed by Alisia Blakely..(Barkan, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakely v. MTA Metro-North Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisia Blakely
Represented By: Steven Laurence Barkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTA Metro-North Railroad
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?