Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. et al v. Doe
Plaintiff: Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. and Dr. Angelos M. Stergiou
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv06014
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/15/2021 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Unless the Court states otherwise, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrial conference in this case in person. The conference will proceed by telephone. The parties and members of the public may access the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 9196964. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/3/2021) (vfr)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. Photographer Contract - Corporate Headshots).(Graif, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Kara Emily Grogan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24855095. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Grogan, Kara)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court thus ORDERS Sellas and Stergiou to show cause by August 6, 2021, why their claims for copyright infringement should not be dismissed because the allegedly infringing conduct is fair use as a matter of law. See Cariou v. Prince, 714 F.3d 694, 707 (2d Cir. 2013); Leibovitz v. Paramount Pictures Corp., 137 F.3d 109, 112 (2d Cir. 1998). The Court DENIES without prejudice the motion for leave to serve expedited discovery (Dkt. No. 4) pending disposition of this issue. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/21/2021) (js)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Discovery /Seeking Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Michael R. Graif dated July 15, 2021. Document filed by Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Oath Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration in Support of Letter Motion Seeking Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery).(Graif, Michael)
July 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Sellas Life Sciences Limited, Other Affiliate Sellas Life Sciences Group Ltd., Other Affiliate SLSG Limited LLC, Other Affiliate Apthera, Inc. for Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc.. Document filed by Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou..(Graif, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Graif, Michael)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24788573)Document filed by Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc., Angelos M. Stergiou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Graif, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc. et al v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sellas Life Sciences Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Robert Graif
Represented By: Kara Emily Grogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Angelos M. Stergiou
Represented By: Michael Robert Graif
Represented By: Kara Emily Grogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?