Naumova v. Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc
Plaintiff: Darina Naumova
Defendant: Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv06017
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #7 Complaint. Document filed by Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc..(Chylinski, Jeremi)
September 8, 2021 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc..(Chylinski, Jeremi)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re: #16 Proposed Stipulation and Order filed by Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc. This Court hereby ORDERS the following: Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to September 8, 2021. Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc answer due 9/8/2021. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/27/2021) (kv)
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc..(Chylinski, Jeremi)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This Court requires that this case shall be ready for trial on 3/28/2022. This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may be filed without leave of Court until 9/17/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2022. Motions due by 12/6/2021. Responses due by 12/20/2021 Replies due by 1/4/2022. Deposition due by 11/15/2021. Discovery due by 11/22/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/27/2021) (tg)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremi L. Chylinski on behalf of Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc..(Chylinski, Jeremi)
August 27, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/27/2021. (Kotowski, Linda)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this notice and enclosures, and to furnish Chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you should send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally, informing the party that any unrepresented party is required to appear at the conference in person. Finally, upon receipt of this notice, please immediately furnish Chambers with a courtesy copy of your complaint and F.R.C.P. Rule 7.1 Statement, if applicable. (as further set forth herein). DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 8-27-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:30am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/13/2021) (kv)
August 5, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service was accepted by Infinity Consulting Solutions Inc.. Service was made by Secretary of State. Document filed by Darina Naumova..(Stillman, Lina)
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc..(jgo)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Darina Naumova..(Stillman, Lina)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Darina Naumova..(Stillman, Lina) Modified on 7/21/2021 (jgo).
July 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on summons must exactly match what is listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 21, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the PDF case caption must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 21, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 21, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 21, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc., re: #7 Complaint. Document filed by Darina Naumova..(Stillman, Lina) Modified on 7/21/2021 (pc).
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24819826)Document filed by Darina Naumova..(Stillman, Lina)
July 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/26/2021. (pc)
July 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Infinity Consulting Solutions (ICS), re: #4 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Darina Naumova..(Stillman, Lina)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Darina Naumova. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Stillman, Lina) Modified on 7/20/2021 (pc).
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): First page is upside down. (pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lina Stillman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code pend (IFP pending);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Caption title reads "Eastern District of New York". Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/19/2021. (pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lina Stillman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the initiating document was incorrectly filed. Please correct the complaint filing and link the subsequent summons request to the correctly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Darina Naumova..(Stillman, Lina)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stillman, Lina) Modified on 7/14/2021 (pc).
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24788750)Document filed by Darina Naumova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter from EEOC).(Stillman, Lina) Modified on 7/14/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naumova v. Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darina Naumova
Represented By: Lina Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Consulting Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Jeremi L. Chylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?