AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A. v. Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. et al
Plaintiff: AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A.
Defendant: Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mitsubishi Corporation, Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc., Mizuho Bank, Ltd., MS Drillship I S.A., Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC, Shinhan Bank, Standard Chartered Bank and UniCredit Bank AG
Case Number: 1:2021cv06018
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 102 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Daniel M. Perry dated October 22, 2021 re: Amended Complaint Filing Dates. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Shinhan Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
October 5, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION for Anton Christopher Brown to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC..(Brown, Anton)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: granting #99 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #99 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew E. Goldsmith dated October 4, 2021. Application GRANTED. Initial pretrial conference in this action and Ruiz v. Bank of China, 21 Civ. 6020, will be on November 22, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. Dial-in: 888-363-4749. Access code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 10/25/2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/04/2021) (ama)
October 4, 2021 Filing 99 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew E. Goldsmith dated October 4, 2021. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
October 4, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: (Telephonic) Initial Conference set for 11/22/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (ama)
September 29, 2021 Filing 98 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mitsubishi Corporation..(Ingber, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Joseph L. Wenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
September 27, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #96 MOTION for Joseph L. Wenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25107257. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 24, 2021 Filing 96 MOTION for Joseph L. Wenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25107257. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joesph L. Wenner, #2 Exhibit A: Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Wenner, Joseph)
September 20, 2021 Filing 95 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Shinhan Financial Group Co., Ltd. for Shinhan Bank. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Shinhan Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #93 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A. ENDORSEMENT: Leave to amend is GRANTED. Amended pleading shall be filed within 14 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) (ama).
September 17, 2021 Filing 93 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew E. Goldsmith dated September 17, 2021 re: #86 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss - Defendants Pre-Motion Letter Pursuant To Court's Individual Rules addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Daniel M. Perry dated August 31, 2021. . Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
September 17, 2021 Filing 92 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Daniel M. Perry dated September 17, 2021 re: Defendant Shinhan Bank Representation and Shinhan Bank Joining Other Defendants in the August 31, 2021 Pre-motion to Dismiss Letter. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Shinhan Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Bonelli on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Shinhan Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Bonelli, Alison)
September 17, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Lees on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Shinhan Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Lees, Alexander)
September 17, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Mumford Perry on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Shinhan Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: granting #87 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #87 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #86 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Defendants Pre-Motion Letter Pursuant To Court's Individual Rules addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 9/17/2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/02/2021) (ama)
September 2, 2021 Filing 87 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #86 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss - Defendants Pre-Motion Letter Pursuant To Court's Individual Rules addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Daniel M. Perry dated August 31, 2021. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew E. Goldsmith dated September 2, 2021. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
August 31, 2021 Filing 86 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss - Defendants Pre-Motion Letter Pursuant To Court's Individual Rules addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Daniel M. Perry dated August 31, 2021. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B).(Perry, Daniel)
August 31, 2021 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Shinhan Bank served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. Service was accepted by Jennifer Chang, Assistant Manager. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher James Houpt on behalf of MS Drillship I S.A., Mitsubishi Corporation..(Houpt, Christopher)
August 30, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew D. Ingber on behalf of MS Drillship I S.A., Mitsubishi Corporation..(Ingber, Matthew)
August 19, 2021 Filing 82 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate JC Flowers & Co., LLC, Other Affiliate Golden Tree Asset Management, LP, Other Affiliate Cerberus Capital Management for Hamburg Commercial Bank AG. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 81 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 Filing 80 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Standard Chartered PLC, Corporate Parent Standard Chartered Holdings Limited for Standard Chartered Bank. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Daniel Mumford Perry to RE-FILE Document #78 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
August 13, 2021 Filing 79 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 78 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Standard Chartered PLC for Standard Chartered Bank. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Jiwon Juliana Yhee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 12, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #75 MOTION for Jiwon Juliana Yhee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24920822. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 11, 2021 Filing 76 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar, Inc. for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 11, 2021 Filing 75 MOTION for Jiwon Juliana Yhee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24920822. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jiwon J. Yhee In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Jiwon J. Yhee, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Yhee, Jiwon)
August 10, 2021 Filing 74 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UniCredit SpA for UniCredit Bank AG. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 10, 2021 Filing 73 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Banque Federative du Credit Mutuel, Corporate Parent Caisse Federale de Credit Mutuel for Credit Industriel ET Commercial. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 72 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 71 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ita Unibanco Holding S.A. for Itau BBA International plc. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 9, 2021 Filing 70 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mizuho Financial Group, Inc. for Mizuho Bank, Ltd.. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 6, 2021 Filing 69 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew E. Goldsmith dated August 6, 2021 re: Response to #67 Letter re: Related Cases. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #65 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #65 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Against, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Daniel M. Perry dated August 4, 2021. Application GRANTED. Initial pretrial conference adjourned from 9/3/21 to 10/13/21 at 12 p.m. SO ORDERED. Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. answer due 8/31/2021; Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch answer due 8/31/2021; Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation answer due 8/31/2021; Credit Industriel ET Commercial answer due 8/31/2021; Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch answer due 8/31/2021; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas answer due 8/31/2021; Hamburg Commercial Bank AG answer due 8/31/2021; Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch answer due 8/31/2021; Itau BBA International plc answer due 8/31/2021; MS Drillship I S.A. answer due 8/31/2021; Mitsubishi Corporation answer due 8/31/2021; Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc. answer due 8/31/2021; Mizuho Bank, Ltd. answer due 8/31/2021; Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC answer due 8/31/2021; Shinhan Bank answer due 8/31/2021; Standard Chartered Bank answer due 8/31/2021; UniCredit Bank AG answer due 8/31/2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/5/2021) (js)
August 5, 2021 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Daniel M. Perry dated August 5, 2021 re: Related Cases. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Perry, Daniel)
August 5, 2021 Filing 66 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi HC Capital Inc. for Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc.. Document filed by Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc...(Stein, David)
August 5, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (js)
August 4, 2021 Filing 65 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Against, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Daniel M. Perry dated August 4, 2021. Document filed by Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 4, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Mumford Perry on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Perry, Daniel)
August 4, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Bonelli on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Bonelli, Alison)
August 4, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Lees on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Credit Industriel ET Commercial, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG..(Lees, Alexander)
August 4, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J Stein on behalf of Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc...(Stein, David)
July 29, 2021 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by a Legal Representative of Corporation Service Company. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 59 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by a Legal Representative of Corporation Service Company. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by a Legal Representative of Corporation Service Company. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. UniCredit Bank AG served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Claudio Caravita, Legal Counsel. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Standard Chartered Bank served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Diana Ruiz, Agent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Shinhan Bank served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Ahpin Wo, Associate. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mizuho Bank, Ltd. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Diana Ruiz, Agent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Itau BBA International plc served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Alessandra Rodrigues, Chief Human Resources Officer. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Michael Smith, Vice President and Chief Auditor. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Diana Ruiz, Agent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. Service was accepted by Randal Umpierre, Agent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 49 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Credit Industriel ET Commercial served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Mary Ginnane, First Vice President. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Diana Ruiz, Agent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. Service was accepted by Diana Ruiz, Agent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew M. Hetherington on behalf of AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Hetherington, Andrew)
July 26, 2021 Filing 45 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America, Inc. for Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC. Document filed by Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC..(Davidoff, Amanda)
July 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Amanda Flug Davidoff to RE-FILE Document #44 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
July 23, 2021 Filing 44 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nomura Holding America, Inc. for Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC. Document filed by Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC..(Davidoff, Amanda) Modified on 7/26/2021 (ldi).
July 23, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anton Christopher Brown on behalf of Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC..(Brown, Anton)
July 23, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Flug Davidoff on behalf of Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC..(Davidoff, Amanda)
July 14, 2021 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Schahin Holding S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Engenharia S.A., Other Affiliate Base Engenharia E Servicos de Petroleo E Gas S.A. f/k/a Schahin Engenharia S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Empreendimentos Imobiliarios LTDA, Other Affiliate Schahin Securitizadora de Creditos Financeiros S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Desenvolvimento Imobiliario S.A., Other Affiliate Companhia Schahin de Ativos, Other Affiliate MTS Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Satasch Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Deep Black Drilling LLP, Other Affiliate Agropecuaria Alto do Turiassu LTDA, Other Affiliate Agropecuari Maranhense S.A. - Agromasa, Other Affiliate Ambar Empreendimentos E Participacoes S/C LTDA, Other Affiliate Aquatica Comunicacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Companhia MS de Participacoes, Other Affiliate Companhia Schahin Securitizadora de Creditos Financeiros S/S LTDA, Other Affiliate Construtora Mogno LTDA, Other Affiliate Foxborough Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Habitecnica Participacoes S.A., Other Affiliate Habitecnica S.A. Empreedimentos Imobiliarios, Administracao e Planejamento, Other Affiliate HBF Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Intelis Automacao e Controle LTDA, Other Affiliate S&S Holding Eletrica S.A., Other Affiliate S2 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate SCH07 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate SCH08 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate SCH13 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate SCH14 Sondas de Producoes Maritimas S.A., Other Affiliate SCH15 Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Schahin Administracao e Informatica LTDA, Other Affiliate Schahin Ativos Companhia Schahin Securitizadora de Creditos Financeiros S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Capital SPE 1 S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Capital SPE 2 S.A., Other Affiliate Schahin Participacoes LTDA, Other Affiliate Base Petroleo e Gas S.A. f/k/a Schahin Petroleo e Gas S.A., Other Affiliate S.M. Participacoes S.A., Other Affiliate HHS Participacoes S.A. for AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A.. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. Counsel for all parties shall appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, held pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, September 3, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. Principal trial counsel shall appear at this and all subsequent conferences. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in:(888) 363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/3/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/14/2021) (ama)
July 14, 2021 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to UniCredit Bank AG..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Standard Chartered Bank..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shinhan Bank..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 35 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MS Drillship I S.A...(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 34 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mizuho Bank, Ltd...(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc...(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mitsubishi Corporation..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 31 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Itau BBA International plc..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Itau BBA International plc..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hamburg Commercial Bank AG..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Credit Industriel ET Commercial..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A...(pc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch..(pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew Edward Goldsmith. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code blank; Dollar Demand 0; County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1334; the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrew Edward Goldsmith. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CREDIT INDUSTRIEL ET COMMERCIAL. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
July 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
July 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
July 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Andrew Edward Goldsmith to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
July 13, 2021 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Credit Industriel et Commercial, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Itau BBA International plc, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Itau BBA International plc, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mitsubishi Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mizuho Bank, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MS Drillship I S.A., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shinhan Bank, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Standard Chartered Bank, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UniCredit Bank AG, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew) Modified on 7/14/2021 (ldi).
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldsmith, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch, CREDIT INDUSTRIEL ET COMMERCIAL, Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Hamburg Commercial Bank AG, Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch, Itau BBA International plc, MS Drillship I S.A., Mitsubishi Corporation, Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc., Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC, Shinhan Bank, Standard Chartered Bank, UniCredit Bank AG. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24788850)Document filed by AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A...(Goldsmith, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A. v. Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AJ Ruiz Consultoria Empresarial S.A.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Goldsmith
Represented By: Andrew M. Hetherington
Represented By: Joseph Wenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Grand Cayman Branch
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Industriel ET Commercial
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamburg Commercial Bank AG
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intesa Sanpaolo, S.p.A., New York Branch
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itau BBA International plc
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Corporation
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Christopher James Houpt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi UFJ Lease & Finance (U.S.A.) Inc.
Represented By: David J Stein
Represented By: Jiwon Juliana Yhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Bank, Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Drillship I S.A.
Represented By: Matthew D. Ingber
Represented By: Christopher James Houpt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Corporate Funding Americas, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Flug Davidoff
Represented By: Anton Christopher Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinhan Bank
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Chartered Bank
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UniCredit Bank AG
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Alison Bonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?