Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC v. Coursera, Inc.
Plaintiff: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Coursera, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06124
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Abbey Gauger dated September 10, 2021. SO ORDERED. Coursera, Inc. answer due 10/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/13/2021) (mml)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Abbey Gauger dated September 10, 2021. Document filed by Coursera, Inc...(Gauger, Abbey)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Abbey Gauger dated August 16, 2021., #1 Complaint. So ordered., (Coursera, Inc. answer due 9/15/2021.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/17/21) (yv)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Coursera, Inc...(Gauger, Abbey)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Abbey Gauger dated August 16, 2021. Document filed by Coursera, Inc...(Gauger, Abbey)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbey Gauger on behalf of Coursera, Inc...(Gauger, Abbey)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Coursera, Inc. served on 7/26/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service was accepted by Judy Carkner. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(vf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Coursera, Inc. (vf)
July 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Coursera, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC..(Hoffman, David)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Hoffman, David)
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hoffman, David)
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coursera, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24805783)Document filed by Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US7299067).(Hoffman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC v. Coursera, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riggs Technology Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David John Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coursera, Inc.
Represented By: Abbey Gauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?