PEPPER et al v. LEVY
Plaintiff: Avery H Pepper and Ariel R Posh
Defendant: Ronald N Levy
Case Number: 1:2021cv06237
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST MOTION to Serve Defendant Ronald Levy. Document filed by Avery H Pepper, Ariel R Posh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 thru 5, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 6 thru 9, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 10 thru 18, #4 Text of Proposed Order Complete and Effective Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order Alternate Service).(Weinstein, Mark)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Avery H Pepper, Ariel R Posh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Weinstein, Mark)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Since this case was transferred in from the U.S. District Court - District of New Jersey on July 22, 2021, there has been no activity aside from the notice of appearance filed by Plaintiffs' counsel on July 29, 2021. ECF No. 9. Accordingly, Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to submit a status report on how they would like to proceed with the case no later than August 23, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/16/2021) (vfr)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Jay Weinstein on behalf of Avery H Pepper, Ariel R Posh..(Weinstein, Mark)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey; Case Number: 2:21-cv-00376. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Transfer Case. This case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 7/21/2021. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 7/21/2021. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals for all further proceedings. Judge Kevin McNulty no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/28/2021. (smf) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York . Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 thru 5, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 6 thru 9, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 10 thru 16, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(KOTSATOS, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 4/27/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RONALD N LEVY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RONALD N LEVY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11945845) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AVERY H PEPPER, ARIEL R POSH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(KOTSATOS, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. (ps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PEPPER et al v. LEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery H Pepper
Represented By: John E. Kotsatos
Represented By: Mark Jay Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel R Posh
Represented By: John E. Kotsatos
Represented By: Mark Jay Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald N Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?