Garay v. NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation
Plaintiff: Julie Garay
Defendant: NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv06244
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Maxwell D. Leighton dated August 16, 2021. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 10. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/16/21) (yv)
August 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation answer due 10/1/2021. (yv)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Maxwell D. Leighton dated August 16, 2021. Document filed by NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation..(Leighton, Maxwell)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021. Document filed by Julie Garay..(Cohen, Randi)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation..(pc)
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Julie Garay..(Cohen, Randi)
July 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randi Melissa Cohen to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title must exactly match what is listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/20/2021 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/23/2021) (vfr)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Julie Garay..(Cohen, Randi) Modified on 7/26/2021 (pc).
July 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randi Melissa Cohen to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party Name Error; defendant party name listed on Summons and Summons caption does not correspond to pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
July 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kimberly Kalmanson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (vf)
July 23, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
July 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
July 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cohen, Randi)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Health and Hospitals Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Julie Garay..(Cohen, Randi) Modified on 7/23/2021 (vf).
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randi Melissa Cohen on behalf of Julie Garay..(Cohen, Randi)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24828464)Document filed by Julie Garay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Right to Sue Notice).(Kalmanson, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garay v. NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Garay
Represented By: Randi Melissa Cohen
Represented By: Kimberly Kalmanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Health and Hospitals Corporation
Represented By: Maxwell Douglas Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?