Accardi et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Plaintiff: Jill Accardi, Alice V. Alexander, Theresa Allegretta, Christine Arnold, Barbara Bekkedahl, Matthew Blair, Robert Blair, Jr., Ann Borello, Michael Borello, Thomas Borello, Ann Cappadonna, Edward J. Finegan, Gloria Finegan, Kristin M. Finegan, Patrick J. Finegan, Daniel Flanagan, Kristin Folberth, Denise Grossarth, Drew Hanson, Veronica Horne, Caroline Lodewyks, Danny Lodewyks, Kimberly Lodewyks, Tiffany Lodewyks, Daniel Mahoney, Kevin P. Mahoney, Jr., Pamela Mahoney, Brian Scott Mansberger, Christian Caleb McLean, Herman Benjamin McLean, Michele McLean, Marcia McLean-Sastri, Doreen Morstatt, Joseph Thomas Morstatt, Meghan Lee Morstatt, Michael Andrew Morstatt, Robin Mundy-Sutton, William T. Mundy, Kathleen Nerney, Marian Pennachio, Andrew Pillersdorf, Kerrie A. Rider, Lois Rothenberg, Elizabeth Schlueter, Genevieve Sharp, Julia Skrak, Robin Mundy Sutton, Josh Weismer and Stephanie Weismer
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv06247
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
August 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
August 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
August 17, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03 MDL 1570. Document filed by Jill Accardi(individually, as surviving child of William Mundy), Jill Accardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Mundy, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of William Mundy), Alice V. Alexander, Theresa Allegretta, Christine Arnold, Barbara Bekkedahl, Matthew Blair(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Matthew Blair(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Robert Blair, Jr(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Robert Blair, Jr(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Ann Borello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gaetano Borello, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Gaetano Borello), Ann Borello(individually, as surviving spouse of Gaetano Borello), Michael Borello, Thomas Borello, Ann Cappadonna, Edward J. Finegan, Gloria Finegan(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Finegan), Gloria Finegan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Finegan, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Patrick Finegan), Kristin M. Finegan, Patrick J. Finegan, Daniel Flanagan, Kristin Folberth(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Kristin Folberth(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Denise Grossarth(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Grossarth), Denise Grossarth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Grossarth, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Glenn Grossarth), Drew Hanson, Veronica Horne, Caroline Lodewyks(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Lodewyks), Caroline Lodewyks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Lodewyks, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Matthew Lodewyks), Danny Lodewyks, Kimberly Lodewyks, Tiffany Lodewyks, Daniel Mahoney, Kevin P. Mahoney, Jr, Pamela Mahoney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr., Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr.), Pamela Mahoney(individually, as surviving spouse of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr.), Brian Scott Mansberger, Christian Caleb McLean, Herman Benjamin McLean, Michele McLean(individually, as surviving spouse of Hernan McLean), Michele McLean(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Hernan McLean, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Hernan McLean), Marcia McLean-Sastri, Doreen Morstatt(as surviving spouse of Joseph A. Morstatt), Doreen Morstatt(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph A. Morstatt, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Joseph A. Morstatt), Joseph Thomas Morstatt, Meghan Lee Morstatt, Michael Andrew Morstatt, William T. Mundy, Robin Mundy-Sutton, Kathleen Nerney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin P. Nerney, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Kevin P. Nerney), Kathleen Nerney(individually, as surviving spouse of Kevin P. Nerney), Marian Pennachio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Lanza, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of James Lanza), Marian Pennachio(individually, as surviving sibling of James Lanza), Andrew Pillersdorf, Kerrie A. Rider, Lois Rothenberg, Elizabeth Schlueter, Genevieve Sharp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Sharp, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of William Sharp), Genevieve Sharp(individually, as surviving spouse of William Sharp), Julia Skrak, Robin Mundy Sutton, Josh Weismer, Stephanie Weismer..(Cannavo, Vito)
July 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (aea)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic of Iran..(gp)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Vito A. Cannavo dated 07/27/2021 re: Refer case to 03-md-1570. Document filed by Jill Accardi(individually, as surviving child of William Mundy), Jill Accardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Mundy, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of William Mundy), Alice V. Alexander, Theresa Allegretta, Christine Arnold, Barbara Bekkedahl, Matthew Blair(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Matthew Blair(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Robert Blair, Jr(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Robert Blair, Jr(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Ann Borello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gaetano Borello, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Gaetano Borello), Ann Borello(individually, as surviving spouse of Gaetano Borello), Michael Borello, Thomas Borello, Ann Cappadonna, Edward J. Finegan, Gloria Finegan(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Finegan), Gloria Finegan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Finegan, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Patrick Finegan), Kristin M. Finegan, Patrick J. Finegan, Daniel Flanagan, Kristin Folberth(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Kristin Folberth(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Denise Grossarth(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Grossarth), Denise Grossarth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Grossarth, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Glenn Grossarth), Drew Hanson, Veronica Horne, Caroline Lodewyks(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Lodewyks), Caroline Lodewyks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Lodewyks, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Matthew Lodewyks), Danny Lodewyks, Kimberly Lodewyks, Tiffany Lodewyks, Daniel Mahoney, Kevin P. Mahoney, Jr, Pamela Mahoney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr., Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr.), Pamela Mahoney(individually, as surviving spouse of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr.), Brian Scott Mansberger, Christian Caleb McLean, Herman Benjamin McLean, Michele McLean(individually, as surviving spouse of Hernan McLean), Michele McLean(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Hernan McLean, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Hernan McLean), Marcia McLean-Sastri, Doreen Morstatt(as surviving spouse of Joseph A. Morstatt), Doreen Morstatt(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph A. Morstatt, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Joseph A. Morstatt), Joseph Thomas Morstatt, Meghan Lee Morstatt, Michael Andrew Morstatt, William T. Mundy, Robin Mundy-Sutton, Kathleen Nerney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin P. Nerney, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Kevin P. Nerney), Kathleen Nerney(individually, as surviving spouse of Kevin P. Nerney), Marian Pennachio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Lanza, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of James Lanza), Marian Pennachio(individually, as surviving sibling of James Lanza), Andrew Pillersdorf, Kerrie A. Rider, Lois Rothenberg, Elizabeth Schlueter, Genevieve Sharp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Sharp, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of William Sharp), Genevieve Sharp(individually, as surviving spouse of William Sharp), Julia Skrak, Robin Mundy Sutton, Josh Weismer, Stephanie Weismer..(Cannavo, Vito)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jill Accardi(individually, as surviving child of William Mundy), Jill Accardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Mundy, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of William Mundy), Alice V. Alexander, Theresa Allegretta, Christine Arnold, Barbara Bekkedahl, Matthew Blair(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Matthew Blair(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Robert Blair, Jr(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Robert Blair, Jr(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Ann Borello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gaetano Borello, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Gaetano Borello), Ann Borello(individually, as surviving spouse of Gaetano Borello), Michael Borello, Thomas Borello, Ann Cappadonna, Edward J. Finegan, Gloria Finegan(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Finegan), Gloria Finegan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Finegan, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Patrick Finegan), Kristin M. Finegan, Patrick J. Finegan, Daniel Flanagan, Kristin Folberth(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Kristin Folberth(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Denise Grossarth(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Grossarth), Denise Grossarth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Grossarth, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Glenn Grossarth), Drew Hanson, Veronica Horne, Caroline Lodewyks(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Lodewyks), Caroline Lodewyks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Lodewyks, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Matthew Lodewyks), Danny Lodewyks, Kimberly Lodewyks, Tiffany Lodewyks, Daniel Mahoney, Kevin P. Mahoney, Jr, Pamela Mahoney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr., Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr.), Pamela Mahoney(individually, as surviving spouse of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr.), Brian Scott Mansberger, Christian Caleb McLean, Herman Benjamin McLean, Michele McLean(individually, as surviving spouse of Hernan McLean), Michele McLean(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Hernan McLean, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Hernan McLean), Marcia McLean-Sastri, Doreen Morstatt(as surviving spouse of Joseph A. Morstatt), Doreen Morstatt(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph A. Morstatt, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Joseph A. Morstatt), Joseph Thomas Morstatt, Meghan Lee Morstatt, Michael Andrew Morstatt, William T. Mundy, Robin Mundy-Sutton, Kathleen Nerney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin P. Nerney, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Kevin P. Nerney), Kathleen Nerney(individually, as surviving spouse of Kevin P. Nerney), Marian Pennachio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Lanza, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of James Lanza), Marian Pennachio(individually, as surviving sibling of James Lanza), Andrew Pillersdorf, Kerrie A. Rider, Lois Rothenberg, Elizabeth Schlueter, Genevieve Sharp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Sharp, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of William Sharp), Genevieve Sharp(individually, as surviving spouse of William Sharp), Julia Skrak, Robin Mundy Sutton, Josh Weismer, Stephanie Weismer..(Cannavo, Vito)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cannavo, Vito)
July 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Vito A. Cannavo, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
July 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Vito A. Cannavo to Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet, Civil Cover Sheet is filed as its own separate event not as an attachment; and Civil Cover Sheet not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
July 23, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vito A. Cannavo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand Blank; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
July 23, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 23, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
July 23, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-md-1570. (vf)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24828844)Document filed by Daniel Mahoney, Tiffany Lodewyks, Stephanie Weismer, Daniel Flanagan, Matthew Blair(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Drew Hanson, Gloria Finegan(individually, as surviving spouse of Patrick Finegan), Edward J. Finegan, Doreen Morstatt(as surviving spouse of Joseph A. Morstatt), Kerrie A. Rider, Veronica Horne, Elizabeth Schlueter, Robin Mundy Sutton, Patrick J. Finegan, Robert Blair, Jr(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Kimberly Lodewyks, Pamela Mahoney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr., Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr.), Ann Borello(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gaetano Borello, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Gaetano Borello), Robin Mundy-Sutton, Caroline Lodewyks(individually, as surviving spouse of Matthew Lodewyks), Kathleen Nerney(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kevin P. Nerney, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Kevin P. Nerney), Herman Benjamin McLean, Genevieve Sharp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Sharp, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of William Sharp), Michele McLean(individually, as surviving spouse of Hernan McLean), Ann Borello(individually, as surviving spouse of Gaetano Borello), Ann Cappadonna, Marian Pennachio(as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Lanza, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of James Lanza), Julia Skrak, Lois Rothenberg, Joseph Thomas Morstatt, Kristin M. Finegan, Josh Weismer, Andrew Pillersdorf, Jill Accardi(individually, as surviving child of William Mundy), Gloria Finegan(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Patrick Finegan, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Patrick Finegan), Jill Accardi(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Mundy, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of William Mundy), Danny Lodewyks, Denise Grossarth(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Grossarth), Caroline Lodewyks(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Matthew Lodewyks, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Matthew Lodewyks), Michele McLean(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Hernan McLean, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Hernan McLean), Thomas Borello, Genevieve Sharp(individually, as surviving spouse of William Sharp), William T. Mundy, Denise Grossarth(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Grossarth, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Glenn Grossarth), Marian Pennachio(individually, as surviving sibling of James Lanza), Kristin Folberth(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Marcia McLean-Sastri, Meghan Lee Morstatt, Kristin Folberth(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Michael Borello, Barbara Bekkedahl, Alice V. Alexander, Pamela Mahoney(individually, as surviving spouse of Kevin P. Mahoney, Sr.), Robert Blair, Jr(as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Robert Blair, Deceased and on behalf of beneficiaries of Robert Blair), Kathleen Nerney(individually, as surviving spouse of Kevin P. Nerney), Michael Andrew Morstatt, Matthew Blair(individually, as surviving child of Robert Blair), Christian Caleb McLean, Theresa Allegretta, Kevin P. Mahoney, Jr, Brian Scott Mansberger, Doreen Morstatt(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph A. Morstatt, Deceased and on behalf of all beneficiaries of Joseph A. Morstatt), Christine Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Cannavo, Vito)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accardi et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Accardi
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice V. Alexander
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Allegretta
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Arnold
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Bekkedahl
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Blair
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Blair, Jr.
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Borello
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Borello
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Borello
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Cappadonna
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Finegan
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Finegan
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin M. Finegan
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J. Finegan
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Flanagan
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Folberth
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Grossarth
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Hanson
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Horne
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Lodewyks
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lodewyks
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Lodewyks
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Lodewyks
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mahoney
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin P. Mahoney, Jr.
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Mahoney
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Scott Mansberger
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Caleb McLean
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Benjamin McLean
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele McLean
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia McLean-Sastri
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Morstatt
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thomas Morstatt
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Lee Morstatt
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Andrew Morstatt
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Mundy-Sutton
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Mundy
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Nerney
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Pennachio
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pillersdorf
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerrie A. Rider
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Rothenberg
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Schlueter
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Sharp
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Skrak
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Mundy Sutton
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Weismer
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Weismer
Represented By: Vito A. Cannavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?