Hye v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Patrick Hye
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv06304
Filed: July 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 tt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sj)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Patrick Hye..(Ctorides, Christina)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference will be held at October 7, 2021 at 10:40 a.m. The conference will be telephonic. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. The Court will call the parties at the number provided in the joint letter (discussed below) once the conference is ready to begin. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/12/2021) (kv)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Patrick Hye..(Ctorides, Christina)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against United States of America. Document filed by Patrick Hye..(Ctorides, Christina)
July 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christina Ctorides to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
July 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christina Ctorides to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christina Ctorides. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PATRICK HYE; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
July 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christina Ctorides. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); Dollar Demand $2,000,000,000; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
July 25, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ctorides, Christina)
July 25, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by PATRICK HYE..(Ctorides, Christina) Modified on 7/26/2021 (jgo).
July 25, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against PATRICK HYE. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24837548)Document filed by PATRICK HYE..(Ctorides, Christina) Modified on 7/26/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hye v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Hye
Represented By: Christina Ctorides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?