Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance v. Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan et al
Plaintiff: Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance
Defendant: Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan, Richard Markowitz, Luke McGee, John van Merkensteijn, FGC Securities LLC and Stephen Wheeler
Case Number: 1:2021cv06402
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FGC Securities LLC..(Napierala, Natalie)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #29 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Robert H. Pees dated September 2, 2021., #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/3/2021) (kv)
September 2, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniella Roseman on behalf of Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan, Luke McGee..(Roseman, Daniella)
September 2, 2021 Filing 29 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Robert H. Pees dated September 2, 2021. Document filed by Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan, Luke McGee..(Pees, Robert)
September 2, 2021 Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan..(Pees, Robert)
September 2, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Hardy Pees on behalf of Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan, Luke McGee..(Pees, Robert)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Sharon L. McCarthy dated 09/01/2021. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/2/2021) (jca)
September 1, 2021 Filing 25 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Sharon L. McCarthy dated 09/01/2021. Document filed by John van Merkensteijn..(McCarthy, Sharon)
August 31, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Louise McCarthy on behalf of John van Merkensteijn..(McCarthy, Sharon)
August 31, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Scott Bahnsen on behalf of John van Merkensteijn..(Bahnsen, Nicholas)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Natalie A. Napierala dated August 27, 2021. Application granted. SO ORDERED. #1 Complaint,. FGC Securities LLC answer due 11/1/2021; Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan answer due 11/1/2021; Luke McGee answer due 11/1/2021; John van Merkensteijn answer due 11/1/2021; Stephen Wheeler answer due 11/1/2021. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/30/2021) (vfr)
August 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/1/2021. (vfr)
August 27, 2021 Filing 21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Natalie A. Napierala dated August 27, 2021. Document filed by FGC Securities LLC, Stephen Wheeler..(Napierala, Natalie)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Alan E. Schoenfeld dated August 24, 2021. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Richard Markowitz answer due 11/1/2021. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/25/2021) (vfr)
August 24, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Alan E. Schoenfeld dated August 24, 2021. Document filed by Richard Markowitz..(Schoenfeld, Alan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Lloyd Yaeger on behalf of FGC Securities LLC, Stephen Wheeler..(Yaeger, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natalie Ann Napierala on behalf of FGC Securities LLC, Stephen Wheeler..(Napierala, Natalie)
August 20, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Schoenfeld on behalf of Richard Markowitz..(Schoenfeld, Alan)
August 11, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 11/23/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
July 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
July 29, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-06392-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
July 28, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stephen Wheeler. (vf)
July 28, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John van Merkensteijn. (vf)
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Luke McGee. (vf)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Markowitz. (vf)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FGC Securities LLC. (vf)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan. (vf)
July 28, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
July 28, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
July 28, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 1 21-cv-6392. (vf)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephen Wheeler, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance..(Butler, Jeff)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Van Merkensteijn, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance..(Butler, Jeff)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Luke McGee, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance..(Butler, Jeff)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard Markowitz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance..(Butler, Jeff)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FGC Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance..(Butler, Jeff)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance..(Butler, Jeff)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-6392. Document filed by Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance..(Butler, Jeff)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Butler, Jeff)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FGC Securities LLC, Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan, Richard Markowitz, Luke McGee, John van Merkensteijn, Stephen Wheeler. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24849839)Document filed by Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance..(Butler, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance v. Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingdom of Belgium, Federal Public Service Finance
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Advisory Inc. Pension Plan
Represented By: Robert Hardy Pees
Represented By: Daniella Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Markowitz
Represented By: Alan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke McGee
Represented By: Robert Hardy Pees
Represented By: Daniella Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John van Merkensteijn
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bahnsen
Represented By: Sharon Louise McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGC Securities LLC
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Yaeger
Represented By: Natalie Ann Napierala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Wheeler
Represented By: Michael Lloyd Yaeger
Represented By: Natalie Ann Napierala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?