AMD Medicom Inc. et al v. Astek Innovations, Limited et al
Plaintiff: AMD Medicom Inc. and Medicom Group Inc.
Defendant: Astek Innovations, Limited and Young Innovations, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06533
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Brianne McNicholas Straka to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25135497. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brianne Straka, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Straka, Brianne)
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah K. Brown on behalf of Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc...(Brown, Deborah)
September 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Carl Cherny on behalf of Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc...(Cherny, Steven)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defense counsel must file a notice of appearance on the docket by no later than Friday, September 24, 2021. The parties' request is GRANTED. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is adjourned to Tuesday, November 16, 2021. The initial pre-trial conference, currently scheduled for Friday, October 1, 2021 at 3:00 P.M., is adjourned to Friday, December 3, 2021 at 11:00 A.M. Pre- conference submissions are due no later than Wednesday, November 24, 2021. For a description of the pre- conference submissions requirements, the parties should consult the Court's order at docket entry 11.The initial pre-trial conference will be held remotely. All parties and any interested members of the public must attend by dialing 1-888-363-4749, using the access code 3121171, and the security code 6533. All attendees are advised to mute their phones when not speaking and to self-identify each time they speak. Recording or rebroadcasting the proceeding is strictly prohibited by law. Upon a joint request, the Court is happy to refer the parties to their assigned Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/20/21) (yv)
September 20, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 12/3/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (yv)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Adjournment of Initial Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum dated September 20, 2021. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 732 and 725 Patents, #2 Exhibit B - July 15 Letter).(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference (IPTC) in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 1, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 6533. Initial Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/4/2021) (ate)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (vf)
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Young Innovations, Inc. (vf)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Astek Innovations, Limited. (vf)
August 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 3, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Young Innovations, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Astek Innovations, Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Astek Innovations, Limited, Young Innovations, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24876573)Document filed by AMD Medicom Inc., Medicom Group Inc...(Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMD Medicom Inc. et al v. Astek Innovations, Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMD Medicom Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medicom Group Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Lindenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astek Innovations, Limited
Represented By: Steven Carl Cherny
Represented By: Brianne Straka
Represented By: Deborah K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Carl Cherny
Represented By: Brianne Straka
Represented By: Deborah K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?