Liu v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Mei Zhen Liu
Defendant: Secretary, USDHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, Acting Director TRACY RENAUD, Connie Nolan and Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 1:2021cv06551
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/22/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED parties are to submit their Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Joint Letter, as directed below, no later than Wednesday, October 13, 2021. Unless the Court states otherwise, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrial conference in this case in person. The conference will proceed by telephone. The parties and members of the public may access the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 9196964. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/10/2021) (ks) Modified on 9/10/2021 (ks).
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Tracy Renaud..(Byars, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Tracy Renaud. (sj)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas; Tracy Renaud; Connie Nolan, re: #2 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Mei Zhen Liu..(Poon, Yee Ling)
August 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yee Ling Poon to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name error in docket entry, party name must match exactly as pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Matorkas; Tracy Renaud; Connie Nolan, re: #2 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Mei Zhen Liu.(Poon, Yee Ling) Modified on 8/5/2021 (sj).
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Poon, Yee Ling)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Alejandro Mayorkas, Connie Nolan, Tracy Renaud.Document filed by Mei Zhen Liu..(Poon, Yee Ling)
August 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Yee Ling Poon to Document No. #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet; Civil Cover Sheet is filed as a separate event not as an attachment; and Signature Error; Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney not provided. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yee Ling Poon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mei Zhen Liu; Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, Connie Nolan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yee Ling Poon to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; and Signature Error, Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney not provided on pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yee Ling Poon to Document No. #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Summons Request are filed as a separate event not as an attachment. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yee Ling Poon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 540 (Mandamus & Other). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 899 (Other Statutes: Admin. Proced. Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision)). (vf)
August 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against All Defendants (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24881186).Document filed by Mei Zhen Liu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons).(Poon, Yee Ling) Modified on 8/4/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mei Zhen Liu
Represented By: Yee Ling Poon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, USDHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director TRACY RENAUD
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Nolan
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?