Yang et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: JINGUAN YANG, YAN LI, S Y, Infant and Jingyuan Yang
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc, d/b/a New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hosptial, New York-Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center and New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc doing business as New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital
Case Number: 1:2021cv06563
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. United States of America served on 8/16/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Jingyuan Yang(individually); Jingyuan Yang(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant); Yan Li(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant); Yan Li(Individually )..(Schwartz, Meryl)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital on 08/20/2021. Service was accepted by Joselin D. Document filed by Yan Li(Individually ), Yan Li(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant), Jingyuan Yang(individually), Jingyuan Yang(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant)..(Schwartz, Meryl)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, served. United States of America served on 8/20/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. Service was accepted by Derrick Mayers. Document filed by Jingyuan Yang(individually); Jingyuan Yang(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant); Yan Li(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant); Yan Li(Individually )..(Schwartz, Meryl)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on New Yor -Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center on 08/17/2021. Service was accepted by Joslin Durnm authorized to accept. Document filed by Yan Li(Individually ), Yan Li(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant), Jingyuan Yang(individually), Jingyuan Yang(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant)..(Schwartz, Meryl)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System Inc on 08*17/2021. Service was accepted by Joslin Durnm authorized to accept. Document filed by Yan Li(Individually ), Yan Li(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant), Jingyuan Yang(individually), Jingyuan Yang(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant)..(Schwartz, Meryl)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tomoko Onozawa on behalf of United States of America..(Onozawa, Tomoko)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc, New York-Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center, United States of America. (sj)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to USA, New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc. d/b/a New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital and New York-Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Yan Li(Individually ), Yan Li(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant), Jingyuan Yang(individually), Jingyuan Yang(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant)..(Schwartz, Meryl)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc, New York-Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center, United States of America. Document filed by Jingyuan Yang(individually), Jingyuan Yang(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant), Yan Li(and as parents and natural guardians of S.Y., an infant), Yan Li(Individually )..(Schwartz, Meryl)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Meryl Iris Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error; additional party( New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital) listed on summons that does not correspond to pleading caption; not all the filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Meryl Iris Schwartz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc, d/b/a New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hosptial, New York-Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JINGUAN YANG, YAN LI. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Meryl Iris Schwartz. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: S.Y., an infant. The party was added to the case in error. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Meryl Iris Schwartz. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Dollar Demand Blank; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 2 (U.S. Government Defendant); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Meryl Iris Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney not provided on pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to USA, New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc. d/b/a New York Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital and New York-Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by YAN LI, S Y, Infant, JINGUAN YANG..(Schwartz, Meryl) Modified on 8/4/2021 (vf).
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schwartz, Meryl)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc, d/b/a New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hosptial, New York-Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24883465)Document filed by JINGUAN YANG, S Y, Infant, YAN LI.(Schwartz, Meryl) Modified on 8/4/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JINGUAN YANG
Represented By: Meryl Iris Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAN LI
Represented By: Meryl Iris Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S Y, Infant
Represented By: Meryl Iris Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jingyuan Yang
Represented By: Meryl Iris Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Tomoko Onozawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc, d/b/a New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hosptial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York-Presbyterian Weill Cornell Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System, Inc doing business as New York-Presbyterian Lower Manhattan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?