Sothebys, Inc. v. Thut et al
Plaintiff: Sothebys, Inc.
Defendant: Frederic Thut, Bettina Von Marnitz Thut and FAAM, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06574
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. FAAM, LLC served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. Service was accepted by Yvette McGhee, Authorized Agent of Florida's Secretary of State. Document filed by Sothebys, Inc...(Scala, Aimee)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Cossu on behalf of Sothebys, Inc...(Cossu, Paul)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: is case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, November 5, 2021 at 3:15 pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED parties are to submit their Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Joint Letter, as directed below, no later than Wednesday, October 27, 2021. Unless the Court states otherwise, the Court will not hold the upcoming initial pretrialconference in this case in person. The conference will proceed by telephone. The parties and members of the public may access the conference by dialing (888) 363-4749 and entering access code 9196964. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 03:15 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/10/2021) (ama)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to FAAM, LLC. (sj)
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to FAAM, LLC, re: #10 Complaint. Document filed by Sothebys, Inc...(Scala, Aimee)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against FAAM, LLC, Frederic Thut, Bettina Von Marnitz Thut. Document filed by Sothebys, Inc...(Scala, Aimee)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to FAAM, LLC. (vf)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bettina Von Marnitz Thut. (vf)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frederic Thut. (vf)
August 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Aimee Scala to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error; Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney user not provided on pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 5, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aimee Scala. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294 Breach of Contract. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract. (vf)
August 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Aimee Scala. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 8/9/2021..(jgo)
August 4, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00..(Scala, Aimee)
August 4, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24887611..(Scala, Aimee)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent York Holdings International, Inc. for Sothebys, Inc.. Document filed by Sothebys, Inc...(Scala, Aimee)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Scala, Aimee)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FAAM, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sothebys, Inc...(Scala, Aimee)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bettina Von Marnitz Thut, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sothebys, Inc...(Scala, Aimee)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frederic Thut, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sothebys, Inc...(Scala, Aimee)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against FAAM, LLC, Frederic Thut, Bettina Von Marnitz Thut. (Filing Fee $ 402.00.)Document filed by Sothebys, Inc.(Scala, Aimee) Modified on 8/5/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sothebys, Inc. v. Thut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sothebys, Inc.
Represented By: Aimee Scala
Represented By: Paul Cossu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederic Thut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettina Von Marnitz Thut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAAM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?