Edmar Financial Company, LLC et al v. Currenex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edmar Financial Company, LLC and Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,
Defendant: Currenex, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, HC Technologies, LLC, State Street Bank and Trust Company and John Doe Defendants 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv06598
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/15/2021) (va)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Motion for Elliott M. Bacon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/14/21) (yv)
September 3, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Elliott M. Bacon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25016404. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 2, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Elliott M. Bacon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25016404. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by HC Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Of Good Standing, #2 Declaration Of Elliott M. Bacon In Support, #3 Proposed Order).(Bacon, Elliott)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #22 Motion for Samer M. Musallam to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Samer M. Musallam for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/2/21) (yv)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #21 Motion for Robert G. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Robert G. Jones for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/1/21) (yv)
September 1, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Samer M. Musallam to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25004082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Samer M. Musallam to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25004082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Currenex, Inc., State Street Bank and Trust Company..(Musallam, Samer)
August 31, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Robert G. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25001921. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Currenex, Inc., State Street Bank and Trust Company..(Jones, Robert)
August 31, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Robert G. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25001921. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Simkin on behalf of Currenex, Inc., State Street Bank and Trust Company..(Simkin, Alexander)
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregg L Weiner on behalf of Currenex, Inc., State Street Bank and Trust Company..(Weiner, Gregg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HC Tech Holdings, LLC for HC Technologies, LLC. Document filed by HC Technologies, LLC..(Wilson, Peter)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Ginewicz Wilson on behalf of HC Technologies, LLC..(Wilson, Peter)
August 25, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rishi Nachiketa Zutshi on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC..(Zutshi, Rishi)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC..(Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the signatory parties, subject to the Court's approval, that: 1. Defendants shall each answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 13, 2021. If one or more Defendants moves to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by December 17, 2021. Defendants shall file their reply or replies by January 28, 2022. 2. If Plaintiffs elect to amend the Complaint in response to the filing of any motion(s) to dismiss, they shall notify Defendants no later than November 12, 2021. At that point, the parties shall meet and confer in good faith with regard to a new schedule in this action. 3. Nothing in this stipulation prevents any party from seeking further extensions on the consent of the parties or from the Court. 4. This stipulation may be executed in counterparts. Currenex, Inc. answer due 10/13/2021; Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC answer due 10/13/2021; HC Technologies, LLC answer due 10/13/2021; State Street Bank and Trust Company answer due 10/13/2021.( Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2021., Responses due by 12/17/2021, Replies due by 1/28/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/25/2021) (tg)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Currenex, Inc., State Street Bank and Trust Company..(Weiner, Gregg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brockett, Daniel)
August 11, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeremy Andersen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of California, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Andersen, Jeremy)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #11) MOTION for Jeremy D. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeremy Andersen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing with the Supreme Court of California, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Andersen, Jeremy) Modified on 8/10/2021 (lb).
August 6, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #8 MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24895074. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Ruddy on behalf of Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,..(Ruddy, Mark)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24895074. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeremy Andersen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order).(Andersen, Jeremy) Modified on 8/6/2021 (bcu).
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Mun-Yin Seck on behalf of Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,..(Seck, Christopher)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Lawrence Brockett on behalf of Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,..(Brockett, Daniel)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Currenex, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, HC Technologies, LLC, State Street Bank and Trust Company..(pc)
August 5, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 5, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 5, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,..(Brockett, Daniel)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Currenex, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co. LLC, HC Technologies, LLC, State Street Bank and Trust Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,..(Brockett, Daniel)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brockett, Daniel)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Currenex, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, HC Technologies, LLC, John Doe Defendants 1-5, State Street Bank and Trust Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24889198)Document filed by Edmar Financial Company, LLC, Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,..(Brockett, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmar Financial Company, LLC et al v. Currenex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmar Financial Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Christopher Mun-Yin Seck
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Mark Ruddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irish Blue & Gold, Inc.,
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Christopher Mun-Yin Seck
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Mark Ruddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currenex, Inc.
Represented By: Gregg L Weiner
Represented By: Alexander Simkin
Represented By: Robert G. Jones
Represented By: Samer Makram Musallam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Represented By: Rishi Nachiketa Zutshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HC Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Peter Ginewicz Wilson
Represented By: Elliott Morris Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Gregg L Weiner
Represented By: Alexander Simkin
Represented By: Robert G. Jones
Represented By: Samer Makram Musallam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?