Sillam et al. v. Labaton Sucharow LLP et al.
Plaintiff: Gerard Sillam and Aldric Saulnier
Defendant: Labaton Sucharow LLP, Christopher J. Keller and Lawrence A. Sucharow
Case Number: 1:2021cv06675
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The October 28th conference is adjourned as this case becomes "aged" on my calendar within a fixed period after filing delays in service will be compensated for at the end of the case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/27/2021) (js)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven Czik dated 09/24/2021., SECOND LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference of 10.28.2021 addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven Czik dated 09/24/2021. Document filed by Aldric Saulnier, Gerard Sillam..(Czik, Steven)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER terminating #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; terminating #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. ENDORSEMENT: I am confused. You are saying that your clients filed a complaint without having evidence of wrongdoing? Why do you need additional evidence in order to serve the complaint? You filed it; you have the number of days provided in the Federal Rules to serve it, I will not extend that period. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/20/2021) (mml) Modified on 9/22/2021 (mml).
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Mark C. Zauderer dated September 20, 2021 Document filed by Labaton Sucharow LLP..(Zauderer, Mark)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven J. Czik dated 09/17/2021., FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initital Pre Trial addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven J. Czik dated 09/17/2021. Document filed by Aldric Saulnier, Gerard Sillam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from French Counsel).(Czik, Steven)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #8) - FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial PreTrial addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven J. Czik dated 09/15/2021., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Steven J. Czik dated 09/15/2021. Document filed by Aldric Saulnier, Gerard Sillam..(Czik, Steven) Modified on 9/20/2021 (ldi).
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher J. Keller, Labaton Sucharow LLP, Lawrence A. Sucharow..(pc)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LABATON SUCHAROW LLP, CHRISTOPHER J. KELLER LAWRENCE A. SUCHAROW, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aldric Saulnier, Gerard Sillam..(Czik, Steven)
September 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Joseph Czik to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney info is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LABATON SUCHAROW LLP, CHRISTOPHER J. KELLER, and LAWRENCE A. SUCHAROW, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Aldric Saulnier, Gerard Sillam..(Czik, Steven) Modified on 9/13/2021 (pc).
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Czik, Steven)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must participate in a telephone conference on 10/28/2021 at 10:15 a.m. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. Initial Conference set for 10/28/2021 at 10:15 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/20/2021) (tg)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Joseph Czik. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: GERARD SILLAM, ALDRIC SAULNIER, Christopher J. Keller, Labaton Sucharow LLP, LAWRENCE SUCHAROW. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Steven Joseph Czik. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
August 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Joseph Czik. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:75(2);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332;. (pc)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher J. Keller, Labaton Sucharow LLP, LAWRENCE SUCHAROW. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24900747)Document filed by GERARD SILLAM, ALDRIC SAULNIER..(Czik, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sillam et al. v. Labaton Sucharow LLP et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerard Sillam
Represented By: Steven Joseph Czik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldric Saulnier
Represented By: Steven Joseph Czik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labaton Sucharow LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence A. Sucharow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?