Cheng et al v. Zhang Medical P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Cheng and Guo Qiang Chen
Defendant: Zhang Medical P.C. a New York Professional Service Corporation doing business as New Hope Fertility Center, NHFC, Inc., John J. Zhang, Zitao Liu, The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd., PacGenomics, Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Malgorzata Jaremko and Phosphorus, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06682
Filed: August 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 mm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Malgorzata Jaremko, Zitao Liu, NHFC, Inc., PacGenomics, Phosphorus, Inc., The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd., John J. Zhang, Zhang Medical P.C...(gp)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Zhang Medical P.C.; NHFC, Inc.; John J. Zhang; Zitao Liu; The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd.; PacGenomics; Malgorzata Jaremko; Phosphorus, Inc., re: #9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Guo Qiang Chen, Juan Cheng..(Shields, Carolyn)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #4 Complaint against Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Zitao Liu, NHFC, Inc., PacGenomics, The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd., John J. Zhang, Zhang Medical P.C., Malgorzata Jaremko, Phosphorus, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Juan Cheng, Guo Qiang Chen. Related document: #4 Complaint..(Shields, Carolyn)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ying Liu on behalf of Guo Qiang Chen, Juan Cheng..(Liu, Ying)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shields, Carolyn)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shields, Carolyn)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zitao Liu, NHFC, Inc., PacGenomics, The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd., John J. Zhang, Zhang Medical P.C...(pc)
August 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Carolyn J. Shields. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Juan Cheng, Guo Qiang Chen, Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Zitao Liu, NHFC, Inc., PacGenomics, The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd., John Zhang, Zhang Medical P.C.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Carolyn J. Shields to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): multiple citizenships for the plaintiff and defendant were selected. Choose one. (pc)
August 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Carolyn J. Shields. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,500,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
August 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
August 8, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Zitao Liu, NHFC, Inc., PacGenomics, The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd., John Zhang, Zhang Medical P.C.. Document filed by Juan Cheng, Guo Qiang Chen..(Shields, Carolyn)
August 8, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zhang Medical P.C., a New York Professional Service Corporation; NHFC, Inc., a New York corporation; John J. Zhang, an Individual; Zitao Liu, an Individual; The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd., a New York Not-for-Profit Corporation; PacGenomics, a California corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Guo Qiang Chen, Juan Cheng..(Shields, Carolyn)
August 8, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shields, Carolyn) Modified on 8/9/2021 (pc).
August 8, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR COMPLAINT against Juan Cheng, Guo Qiang Chen. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24902274)Document filed by Juan Cheng, Guo Qiang Chen..(Shields, Carolyn) Modified on 8/9/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheng et al v. Zhang Medical P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Cheng
Represented By: Carolyn J. Shields
Represented By: Ying Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guo Qiang Chen
Represented By: Carolyn J. Shields
Represented By: Ying Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhang Medical P.C. a New York Professional Service Corporation doing business as New Hope Fertility Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHFC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zitao Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Catherine Foundation for Reproductive Medicine, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacGenomics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malgorzata Jaremko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phosphorus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?