Keung v. D G Hair Salon Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lin Kwok Keung
Defendant: D G Hair Salon Inc. a New York corporation doing business as D G Hair Salon and Sunland Realty Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06703
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which has been scheduled for November 23, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. by separate Order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/26/2021. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/16/2021) (rro)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Telephonic Conference set for 11/23/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/16/2021) (tg) Modified on 8/18/2021 (tg).
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sunland Realty Inc...(jgo)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to D G Hair Salon Inc...(jgo)
August 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SUNLAND REALTY INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lin Kwok Keung..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to D G HAIR SALON INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lin Kwok Keung..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D G Hair Salon Inc., Sunland Realty Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24907709)Document filed by Lin Kwok Keung..(Weitz, Ben-Zion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keung v. D G Hair Salon Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lin Kwok Keung
Represented By: Ben-Zion Bradley Weitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D G Hair Salon Inc. a New York corporation doing business as D G Hair Salon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunland Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?