HD Media Company, LLC v. Google, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HD Media Company, LLC
Defendant: Google LLC and Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06796
Filed: August 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (451 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS NEWSPAPER PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT., (462 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Newspapers' Consolidated Amended Complaint. . Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mitchell, David)
March 3, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/22/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 3, 2023 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2023 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sadie Herbert, (212) 805-0310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2023.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 27, 2023 Filing 60 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier and Ashley Keller dated 02/27/2023 re: Venue Issue. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
February 16, 2023 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier dated 02/16/2023 re: Response to Dkt. 392. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
February 1, 2023 Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier dated 02/01/2023 re: Per Court's PTO No. 5 [Dkt. 394] Plaintiffs' Topics and Positions for CMC Scheduled February 15, 2023. Document filed by Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc, Appen Media Group, Inc., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Clarksburg Publishing Company.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
January 20, 2023 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier dated 01/13/2023 re: Plaintiffs' Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Genius Media Group, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc, Appen Media Group, Inc., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Clarksburg Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Brown, Alex)
January 14, 2023 Filing 56 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR -(SEE #439 in 1:21-md-3010)) LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier dated 01/13/2023 re: Plaintiffs' Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Appen Media Group, Inc., Nicholas Arrieta, Associated Newspapers Ltd., Mark J. Astarita, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Michael Devaney, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Journal, Inc., Kinin, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Vitor Lindo, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Mail Media, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Organic Panaceas, LLC, Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Robinson Communications Inc, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Rome News Media, LLC, SPX Total Body Fitness LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., SkinnySchool LLC, SkinnySchool LLC, Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, Michael Stellman, Sterling International Consulting Group, Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Surefreight Global LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc., The State of Texas, Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Sara Yberra, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc, Appen Media Group, Inc., Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, Clarksburg Publishing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.) Modified on 1/23/2023 (kj). Modified on 1/23/2023 (kj).
January 13, 2023 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eric Mahr and Justina K. Sessions dated January 13, 2023 re: Proposed ESI Order. Document filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mahr, Eric)
November 22, 2022 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated November 22, 2022 re: Plaintiff Appen Media Group. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Appen Media Group, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mitchell, David)
November 9, 2022 Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (325 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Newspaper Plaintiffs]. . Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Jodlowski, Steven)
November 3, 2022 Filing 52 ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of The Newspaper Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Pursuant to the Court's October 24, 2022 Order re: (39 in 1:21-cv-06884-PKC, 57 in 1:21-cv-06840-PKC, 54 in 1:21-cv-06912-PKC, 47 in 1:21-cv-06796-PKC, 39 in 1:21-cv-06881-PKC, 33 in 1:21-cv-06909-PKC, 30 in 1:22-cv-01705-PKC, 25 in 1:21-cv-08032-PKC, 31 in 1:21-cv-06824-PKC, 39 in 1:21-cv-06817-PKC, 23 in 1:22-cv-01704-PKC, 42 in 1:21-cv-06828-PKC, 22 in 1:21-cv-10186-PKC, 31 in 1:22-cv-06997-PKC, 48 in 1:21-cv-06888-PKC, 30 in 1:21-cv-06915-PKC, 22 in 1:22-cv-01971-PKC, 21 in 1:21-cv-10187-PKC, 56 in 1:21-cv-06871-PKC, 353 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 24 in 1:22-cv-01693-PKC, 36 in 1:21-cv-06794-PKC, 22 in 1:21-cv-10188-PKC, 24 in 1:22-cv-01701-PKC, 28 in 1:21-cv-09523-PKC) Order,,,. Document filed by Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Rome News Media, LLC, J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Journal, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Coastal Point LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, Louisville Publishing, Inc., Something Extra Publishing, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Eagle Printing Company, ECENT Corporation, Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Newton County Appeal Inc., Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., Gould Enterprises, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Facebook Inc., Google LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Newspaper Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Filed Under Seal])Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 353 .(Mitchell, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of The Newspaper Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Pursuant to the Court's October 24, 2022 Order re: (39 in 1:21-cv-06884-PKC, 57 in 1:21-cv-06840-PKC, 54 in 1:21-cv-06912-PKC, 47 in 1:21-cv-06796-PKC, 39 in 1:21-cv-06881-PKC, 33 in 1:21-cv-06909-PKC, 30 in 1:22-cv-01705-PKC, 25 in 1:21-cv-08032-PKC, 31 in 1:21-cv-06824-PKC, 39 in 1:21-cv-06817-PKC, 23 in 1:22-cv-01704-PKC, 42 in 1:21-cv-06828-PKC, 22 in 1:21-cv-10186-PKC, 31 in 1:22-cv-06997-PKC, 48 in 1:21-cv-06888-PKC, 30 in 1:21-cv-06915-PKC, 22 in 1:22-cv-01971-PKC, 21 in 1:21-cv-10187-PKC, 56 in 1:21-cv-06871-PKC, 353 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 24 in 1:22-cv-01693-PKC, 36 in 1:21-cv-06794-PKC, 22 in 1:21-cv-10188-PKC, 24 in 1:22-cv-01701-PKC, 28 in 1:21-cv-09523-PKC) Order,,,. Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - placeholder [filed under seal], #2 Exhibit 2 - Newspaper Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Redacted])Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Mitchell, David)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER PROVISIONALLY GRANTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO SEAL LIMITED PERSONA INFORMATION IN EXHIBIT A TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. MCCALLUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S MOTION TO SEAL LIMITED PERSONAL INFORMATION IN THE OCTOBER 21, 2022 PRIVILEGE LOG in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; granting (349) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. ORDERS that the redacted content within the publicly filed Privilege Log in Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. McCallum in Support of Google LLC's Motion to Seal Limited Personal Information in the October 21, 2022 Privilege Log shall be maintained under seal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/1/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (jca)
October 31, 2022 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from W. Mark Lanier, David Boies, Dena C. Sharp, Tina Wolfson dated 10/31/2022 re: Per Court's Instructions in Pre-Trial Order No. 2 - Plaintiffs Lead Attorneys submit Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of Alaska, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, The State of Texas, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, State of South Dakota, State of Alaska, State of Florida, State of North Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
October 26, 2022 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (325 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Newspaper Plaintiffs]. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Orsini, Kevin)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING NEWSPAPER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL: The Court, having reviewed the relevant submissions and determined that the information sought to be redacted by Meta Platforms, Inc. is competitively sensitive and the interests in preventing competitive harm outweigh any applicable presumption of access, see Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 120 (2d Cir. 2006), hereby: ORDERS that the Newspaper Plaintiffs file a public version of their proposed Amended Complaint that redacts information highlighted in Exhibit A to Meta Platform, Inc.'s Response in Support of the Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal, and that the unredacted proposed Amended Complaint be filed under seal. The sealing application is provisionally approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/24/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ks)
October 20, 2022 Filing 46 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Related Document Number: 323 ..(Orsini, Kevin) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 20, 2022 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Kevin J. Orsini in Support re: (323 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022.. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Orsini, Kevin)
October 20, 2022 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Amit Bhojwani in Support re: (323 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022.. Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Orsini, Kevin)
October 20, 2022 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. (27 in 1:21-cv-09523-PKC, 346 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC, 21 in 1:21-cv-10186-PKC, 35 in 1:21-cv-06794-PKC, 38 in 1:21-cv-06881-PKC, 53 in 1:21-cv-06912-PKC, 21 in 1:22-cv-01971-PKC, 32 in 1:21-cv-06909-PKC, 41 in 1:21-cv-06828-PKC, 29 in 1:21-cv-06915-PKC, 38 in 1:21-cv-06884-PKC, 46 in 1:21-cv-06796-PKC, 30 in 1:21-cv-06824-PKC, 38 in 1:21-cv-06817-PKC, 29 in 1:22-cv-01705-PKC, 21 in 1:21-cv-10188-PKC, 55 in 1:21-cv-06871-PKC, 20 in 1:21-cv-10187-PKC, 23 in 1:22-cv-01701-PKC, 24 in 1:21-cv-08032-PKC, 47 in 1:21-cv-06888-PKC, 22 in 1:22-cv-01704-PKC, 23 in 1:22-cv-01693-PKC, 30 in 1:22-cv-06997-PKC, 56 in 1:21-cv-06840-PKC) Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (tp)
October 19, 2022 Filing 43 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (323 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022. ("Response in Support of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal"). Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Capital Region Independent Media LLC, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Google LLC, Gould Enterprises, Inc., Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc., Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Neighbor Newspapers, Inc., Newton County Appeal Inc., Robinson Communications Inc, Rome News Media, LLC, Savannah Publishing Co., Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Southern Community Newspapers, Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Times Journal, Inc., Union City Daily Messenger, Inc., Weakley County Press, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 334 .(Orsini, Kevin)
October 19, 2022 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (323 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION to Seal Exhibits 2-3 of Newspaper Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David W. Mitchell dated October 5, 2022. . Document filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Redactions)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Orsini, Kevin)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; granting (323) Letter Motion to Seal in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. The application to file under seal is provisionally GRANTED.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/07/202) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; terminating (331) Letter Motion for Conference re: (331 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) LETTER MOTION for Conference re: (297) Protective Order. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ashley Keller dated 10/06/2022. in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC. Google shall file a privilege log within 14 days. Plaintiffs may file a motion 14 days thereafter. Submission of exemplars in camera approved. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/07/202) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
September 30, 2022 Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys - W. Mark Lanier, David Boies, Dena C. Sharp and Tina Wolfson dated 09/30/2022 re: PLA Letter to Update the Court re. Case Management Plan and Discovery Steering Committee. Document filed by The State of Texas.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Lanier, W.)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2: Pursuant to the authority of Rules 16(b) and 23(d)(1), the Court Orders as follows: Any Class Action (by and through its Lead Class Counsel in the case of publishers or Interim Co-Lead Counsel as to advertisers) or any individual plaintiff, i.e., a plaintiff not asserting a class claim, may within 21 days submit a proposed amended pleading containing only Conforming Amendments (both clean copy and copy marked to show changes). Defendant shall set forth its consent or objection within 7 days. If the amended pleading contains only Conforming Amendments, the Court anticipates granting leave to amend and lifting the stay on discovery. "Conforming Amendments" are amendments that (a) add claims or allegations of anticompetitive conduct that were asserted in the TAC and survived the Court's September 13 Opinion & Order or remove claims or allegations of anticompetitive conduct asserted in the TAC that did not survive the September 13 Opinion & Order; (b) amend the allegations of individual harm to the plaintiffs, allegations specific to the named plaintiffs, the class definitions, the state law claims, the damages and relief sought; or (c) are necessitated by the party or counsel's obligations under Rule 11. Any Class Action (by and through Lead Counsel) or any individual plaintiff who wishes to amend its pleading to make amendments that do not fall entirely within the definition of Conforming Amendments may file a motion to amend within 21 days, the defendant or defendants may oppose the motion 21 days thereafter and plaintiff may reply 14 days thereafter. The motion shall annex the proposed amended pleading (clean copy and copy marked to show changes). The pre-motion letter requirement is waived for the motion to amend. Discovery is stayed in such an action pending the hearing and determination of the motion to amend. If no amendment is sought by a plaintiff, defendant or defendants shall answer the complaint or submit a pre-motion letter within 30 days. Lead Counsel for the State plaintiffs (Mr. Lanier), Interim Lead Co-Counsel for the putative advertiser class (Ms. Sharp and Ms. Wolfson) and Lead Counsel for the Publisher Class (Mr. Boies) are collectively referred to as the "Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys." Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys shall meet and confer on a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and each Lead Counsel may designate other counsel to participate in discussions. Within 21 days of this Order, Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys shall submit a joint proposal to counsel for defendant and counsel for any individual plaintiff, whose input and proposed changes should be solicited, considered, discussed and, to the extent of agreement, incorporated in a proposal to be submitted by Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys to the Court within 45 days. Any party may submit written objections or counterproposals within 7 days of the submission to the Court by Plaintiffs' Lead Attorneys. The Court will then issue an Order. The Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order need not and should not provide for every contingency. But it should address at least the matters in the Court's proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order for an ordinary case (omitting paragraphs 1, 2, 9, 10 and 12) modified for the needs of these coordinated cases. Some issues, such as the timing of class certification motions, will be unique to fewer than all cases. The Court is open to expanding the number of deponents above the presumptive limit in Rule 30(a)(2)(A)(1) but will only do so-and may do so from time to time-upon identification of the particular witnesses by name (unless a Rule 30(b)(6) witness) and description of the matters on which he or she has unique knowledge. There will be no duplicative questioning of witnesses, and, absent good cause, no deponent will be examined more than once. The Local Civil Rules of this District, including Local Civil Rule 33.3, and the Court's Individual Practices fully apply to this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/14/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting (302) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Maxwell H Sawyer terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (Nacanther, Florence)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
August 12, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Maxwell H. Sawyer to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by AIM Media Midwest Operating, LLC, AIM Media Texas Operating, LLC, Aim Media Indiana Operating, LLC, Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Charleston Publishing Co., Inc., Clarion Publishing Company, Inc., Clarke Publishing, Inc., Clarksburg Publishing Company, Coastal Point LLC, Commonwealth Publishing Company, Inc., Delta Press Publishing Company, Inc., Delta-Democrat Publishing Company, ECENT Corporation, Eagle Printing Company, Emmerich Newspapers, Incorporated, Enterprise-Tocsin, Inc., Flag Publications, Inc., Franklinton Publishing Co., Inc., Gale Force Media, LLC, Grenada Star, Inc., HD Media Company, LLC, Hattiesburg Publishing, Inc., J.O. Emmerich & Associates, Inc., Journal, Inc., Kosciusko Star-Herald, Inc., Louisville Publishing, Inc., Marion Publishing Company, Montgomery Publishing Co., Inc., Multi Media Channels LLC, Newton County Appeal Inc., Scott Publishing, Inc., Simpson Publishing Co., Inc., Sunland Publishing Company, Inc., Tallulah Publishing, Inc., Tate Record, Inc., Yazoo Newspaper Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Davidson, Stuart)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: re: (217 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (217 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) MOTION to Dismiss Counts I Through IV of State Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. The Court will hear argument on Google's motion to dismiss the States' Third Amended Complaint on August 31, 2022 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 11D. SO ORDERED.:( Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/28/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
May 3, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/19/22 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
May 3, 2022 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/19/2022 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
May 3, 2022 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/19/2022 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: As the Court explained, the States' Third Amended Complaint is a bellwether for the pleadings of other plaintiffs (to the extent applicable to a private party's claim) and so the brief of the Publisher Plaintiffs (Doc 267-3) will be deemed filed on their behalf as parties to the MDL. Google's date for reply is extended to May 5, 2022 and its page limit increased to 30 pages. SO ORDERED., ( Replies due by 5/5/2022.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/06/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...Having considered Ms. Vash's letter of December 17 for certain plaintiffs and Ms. Sessions letter of December 21 for Google, it is hereby Ordered by the Court that, as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: (190 in 1:21-md-03010-PKC) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference and Interim Protective Order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Serina M. Vash dated December 17, 2021. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/21/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (vfr)
October 12, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 12, 2021 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Ceremonial Courtroom 9C is set as an overflow courtroom. Remote telephone information is provided below: Dial in: 1 888-363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
August 12, 2021 Filing 27 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number: 3:21-cv-00077. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 12, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 10, 2021 Filing 26 TRANSFER ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: transferring this action to the Southern District of New York for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel on 8/10/2021. (cc: attys) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 25 COPY OF NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION set for 7/29/2021 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Original filed before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 14, 2021 Filing 24 CORRECTED EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC in support of #15 MOTION for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit R, #2 Corrected Exhibit S, #3 Certificate of Service) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Defendants' #19 and #22 MOTIONS to Extend Time to File Answer and #20 MOTION to Expedite; Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint will be due no later than 21 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the pending petition to centralize this action, or, if the MDL petition is granted, the date by which the transferee judge orders Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/13/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) (Modified on 5/17/2021 to remove link to #21 exhibits and add link to #22 expedited motion) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 22 EXPEDITED MOTION by Google, LLC to Extend Deadline to Respond to #1 Complaint. (Forman, Isaac) (Modified on 5/17/2021 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 21 EXHIBITS by Facebook, Inc. in support of #19 MOTION by Facebook, Inc. to Extend Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. (Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION/REQUEST by Facebook, Inc. for Expedited Decision on Facebook's #19 MOTION to Extend Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. (Wakefield, Jeffrey) (Modified on 5/17/2021 to add link to #19 motion) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Facebook, Inc. to Extend Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. (Wakefield, Jeffrey) (Modified on 5/17/2021 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Vanessa Lavely on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. Local counsel: Jeffrey M. Wakefield. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7944499. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt from WV State Bar)(Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Peter Barbur on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. Local counsel: Jeffrey M. Wakefield. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7944497. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt from WV State Bar)(Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 16 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Kevin Orsini on behalf of Facebook, Inc.. Local counsel: Jeffrey M. Wakefield. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7944490. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt from WV State Bar)(Wakefield, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 15 COPY OF MOTION for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Proceedings by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W) (slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, LLC for Stipulation Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, Statement of Visiting Attorney (Sessions) and Statement of Visiting Attorney (Jacobson) to Plaintiff. (Forman, Isaac) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
March 30, 2021 RESET DEADLINE: Facebook, Inc., Google, LLC answer due 5/18/2021 pursuant to the #11 Stipulation. (mkw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Google, LLC. Local counsel: Isaac R. Forman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7913993. (Forman, Isaac) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Justina K. Sessions on behalf of Google, LLC. Local counsel: Isaac R. Forman. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7913990. (Forman, Isaac) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by HD Media Company, LLC, Google, LLC, Facebook, Inc.; the parties stipulate and agree that the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint is extended to 5/18/2021. (Forman, Isaac) (Modified on 3/31/2021 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Thomas O. Barnett, Esq., Counsel for Facebook, Inc. on 02/17/2021. Facebook, Inc. waiver mailed on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Serina M. Vash on behalf of HD Media Company, LLC. Local counsel: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7878673. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from John C. Herman on behalf of HD Media Company, LLC. Local counsel: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7878669. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF THE SERVICE OF SUMMONS. Waiver signed by Justina K. Sessions, Attorney for Google LLC on 02/10/2021. Google, LLC waiver mailed on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from David W. Mitchell on behalf of HD Media Company, LLC. Local counsel: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7868826. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Stuart A. Davidson on behalf of HD Media Company, LLC. Local counsel: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7868820. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Steven M. Jodlowski on behalf of HD Media Company, LLC. Local counsel: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7868790. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Paul J. Geller on behalf of HD Media Company, LLC. Local counsel: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7868780. (Fitzsimmons, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
January 29, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7866528. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HD Media Company, LLC v. Google, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HD Media Company, LLC
Represented By: Clayton J. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: John C. Herman
Represented By: Mark A. Colantonio
Represented By: Michael Jay Fuller, Jr.
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Geller
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Serina M. Vash
Represented By: Steven Michael Jodlowski
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Robert Patrick Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Isaac Ralston Forman
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Justina K. Sessions
Represented By: Max C. Gottlieb
Represented By: Michael B. Hissam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: Peter Barbur
Represented By: Vanessa Lavely
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Wakefield
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Peter T Barbur
Represented By: Vanessa Allen Lavely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?