Seo v. American Express Credit Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sun Pill Seo
Defendant: American Express Credit Corporation, LVNV Funding, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06825
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Lyons, Kayasha)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jacquelyn A. DiCicco dated 9/24/2021., #1 Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. LVNV Funding, LLC answer due 10/25/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/8/2021) (tg) Modified on 10/8/2021 (tg).
September 27, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Robbin on behalf of LVNV Funding, LLC..(Robbin, Jonathan)
September 27, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jacquelyn A. DiCicco dated 9/24/2021. Document filed by LVNV Funding, LLC..(DiCicco, Jacquelyn)
September 27, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacquelyn Alena DiCicco on behalf of LVNV Funding, LLC..(DiCicco, Jacquelyn)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Alain Cesar dated September 9, 2021.. Granted. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/13/2021) American Express Credit Corporation answer due 10/11/2021 (ks)
September 9, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Alain Cesar dated September 9, 2021. Document filed by Sun Pill Seo..(Cesar, Alain)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kayasha B. Lyons dated August 26, 2021., #1 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED.Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 10/11/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 8/27/2021) (tg)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Kayasha B. Lyons dated August 26, 2021. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Lyons, Kayasha)
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Lyons, Kayasha)
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kayasha Lyons on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc...(Lyons, Kayasha)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. Service was accepted by Randal Umpierre; Intake Specialist. Document filed by Sun Pill Seo..(Cesar, Alain)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. American Express Credit Corporation served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. Service was accepted by Randal Umpierre; Intake Specialist. Document filed by Sun Pill Seo..(Cesar, Alain)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. LVNV Funding, LLC served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Managing Agent. Document filed by Sun Pill Seo..(Cesar, Alain)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig B. Sanders on behalf of Sun Pill Seo..(Sanders, Craig)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (vf)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LVNV Funding, LLC. (vf)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Express Credit Corporation. (vf)
August 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sun Pill Seo..(Cesar, Alain)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LVNV Funding, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sun Pill Seo..(Cesar, Alain)
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Express Credit Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sun Pill Seo..(Cesar, Alain)
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cesar, Alain)
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Express Credit Corporation, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., LVNV Funding, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24929209)Document filed by Sun Pill Seo..(Cesar, Alain)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seo v. American Express Credit Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Pill Seo
Represented By: Alain Cesar
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Jacquelyn Alena DiCicco
Represented By: Jonathan M. Robbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kayasha Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?