E. Remy Martin & Co. v. Sire Spirits LLC et al
Plaintiff: E. Remy Martin & Co.
Defendant: Sire Spirits LLC, Vetroelite Inc. and Vetroelite S.P.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06838
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Kourtney A. Mulcahy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/7/2021) (ks)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Kourtney A. Mulcahy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25159154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Brian C. Bianco to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25160856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Brian C. Bianco to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25160856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sire Spirits LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Good Standing Certificate Illinois, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Brian C. Bianco, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Bianco, Brian)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Kourtney A. Mulcahy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25159154. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sire Spirits LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Good Standing Certificate Illinois, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Kourtney Mulcahy, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Mulcahy, Kourtney)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Business Document Specialist. Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co...(Siegel, David)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/8/21) (yv)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Sire Spirits LLC answer due 10/18/2021. (yv)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that the time for defendants Vetroelite Inc. and Vetroelite S.P.A. ("Defendants") to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended to and including October 18, 2021. This is the first extension of Defendants' time to respond. The requested adjournment affects no other scheduled dates in the action and no such similar extension previously has been given. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the parties to this Stipulation reserve all rights and defenses, including jurisdictional defenses, that they may have, and that entry into this Stipulation shall not impair or otherwise affect such rights and/or defenses. This Stipulation may be signed by the parties in any number of counterparts, each of which when so signed shall be an original, but all of which shall together constitute one and the same instrument. A signed facsimile, photocopy, or electronic copy of this Stipulation shall be deemed an original. SO ORDERED. Vetroelite Inc. answer due 10/18/2021; Vetroelite S.P.A. answer due 10/18/2021. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/7/2021) (vfr)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Weiner on behalf of Sire Spirits LLC..(Weiner, Craig)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Reena Jain dated September 7, 2021. Document filed by Sire Spirits LLC..(Jain, Reena)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sire Spirits LLC..(Jain, Reena)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Reena Jain on behalf of Sire Spirits LLC..(Jain, Reena)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Vetroelite Inc., Vetroelite S.P.A...(Barkan, Matthew)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Sire Spirits LLC served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. Service was accepted by Charlie Blakley, Managing Agent. Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co.., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits A-K served on SIRE SPIRITS LLC c/o UNITED STATES CORPORATION AGENTS INC. on 8/26/2021. Service was accepted by Charlie Blakley, Managing Agent. Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co...(Siegel, David)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on Vetroelite S.P.A. on August 19, 2021. Service was accepted by V. Almira C19. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co.. (Attachments: #1 FedEx Tracking Summary, #2 FedEx Proof of Delivery).(Siegel, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanne Melissa Hamburg on behalf of E. Remy Martin & Co...(Hamburg, Jeanne)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David H Siegel on behalf of E. Remy Martin & Co...(Siegel, David)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Complaint with Exhibits A-K & Civil Cover Sheet, Summons mailed to Vetroelite S.P.A, Via I Maggio, 4, 31024 Ormelle (Treviso), Italy on 08/17/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 7745 4884 3655, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (JKR)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vetroelite S.P.A...(jgo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vetroelite Inc...(jgo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sire Spirits LLC..(jgo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Anthony Farco. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VETROELITE S.P.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co...(Farco, Joseph)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VETROELITE INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co...(Farco, Joseph)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SIRE SPIRITS LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co...(Farco, Joseph)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Farco, Joseph)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent REMY COINTREAU S.A. for E. Remy Martin & Co.. Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co...(Farco, Joseph)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Farco, Joseph)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sire Spirits LLC, Vetroelite Inc., Vetroelite S.P.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24931076)Document filed by E. Remy Martin & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru Exhibit F to Complaint, #2 Exhibit G to Complaint, #3 Exhibit H thru Exhibit K to Complaint).(Farco, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E. Remy Martin & Co. v. Sire Spirits LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Remy Martin & Co.
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Farco
Represented By: David H Siegel
Represented By: Jeanne Melissa Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sire Spirits LLC
Represented By: Craig Weiner
Represented By: Brian Bianco
Represented By: Kourtney A. Mulcahy
Represented By: Reena Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vetroelite Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vetroelite S.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?