Jane Doe 7015 v. Elektra Entertainment Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 7015
Defendant: Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp., James Euringer, Joseph J. Galus and Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv06868
Filed: August 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
2 Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF VOLUTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Plaintiff JANE DOE 7015 and her counsel, hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, as against Defendant JOSEPH J. GALUS. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Joseph J. Galus as a Defendant in this case. SO ORDERED. Joseph J. Galus terminated. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/26/2023) (jca)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #61 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge John P. Cronan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety.(tp)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Joseph J. Galus. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Greenberg, Alan)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #59 Status Report filed by Jane Doe 7015. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. Plaintiff may serve Defendant James Euringer by October 31, 2023. SO ORDERED. ( Service due by 10/31/2023.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/24/2023) (vfr)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Alan Greenberg. RE-FILE Document No. #58 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (tp)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Jane Doe 7015. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 4/24/2023 (tp).
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION AND ORDER For the foregoing reasons, the Moving Defendants motion to dismiss is granted in full. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion pending at Docket Number 46. Plaintiffs request for leave to file a second amended complaint, Pl. Opp. at 25, is denied without prejudice. Should she still wish to amend, by April 21, 2023 she shall file a pre-motion letter in conformity with Rule 6.A of the Courts Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases. By that date, she shall also provide a status update as to the remaining Defendants, including whether they have been served with the Amended Complaint and, if not, whether she requests an extension of time to complete service. Motions terminated: #46 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. filed by Warner Communications LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Music Group Corp.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 3/31/2023) (mhe)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER dismissing as moot #28 Motion to Dismiss. On August 9, 2021, Plaintiff filed the Complaint that initiated this action in New York Supreme Court, New York County. Dkt. 1, Ex. A. Subsequently, Defendants removed the case to this Court on August 15, 2021, Dkt. 1, and moved to dismiss the Complaint on February 14, 2022, Dkt. 28. Within twenty-one days of the filing of that motion, Plaintiff filed her First Amended Complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B) on March 7, 2022. Dkt. 35. Defendants moved to dismiss the First Amended Complaint on April 4, 2022. Dkt. 46. Because Plaintiff's Amended Complaint superseded her initial Complaint, and Defendants have moved to dismiss the Amended Complaint, the Court dismisses as moot the first motion to dismiss and respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to terminate the motion at Docket Number 28. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 8/11/2022) (vfr)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Scott A. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #52 Letter, filed by Warner Communications LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Music Group Corp. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. The Corporate Defendants may file a fifteen-page reply. SO ORDERED. ( Replies due by 4/25/2022.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/22/2022) (vfr)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Brian C. Ascher dated April 21, 2022 re: request to extend reply brief page limit. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc. for Warner Communications LLC. Document filed by Warner Communications LLC..(Ascher, Brian)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the noticed request to withdraw Nicole C. Santora as counsel for Defendants Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC and Warner Music Group Corp. is granted, and the appearance of Ms. Santora is withdrawn as of the date of this Order. Attorney Nicole Santora terminated. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 4/20/2022) (vfr)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Jane Doe 7015. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Alan A. Greenberg in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Letter to Court re Request of Oral Argument for Warner's 12b6 Motion).(Greenberg, Alan)
April 10, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Alison J. Nathan is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DECLARATION of BRIAN C. ASCHER in Support re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - NYS Entity Name History, #3 Exhibit C - MSI Recording Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - B - NYS Assumed Name History).(Ascher, Brian)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #46 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for NICOLE C. SANTORA to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole C. Santora, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Santora, Nicole)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the noticed request to withdraw Sarah L. Segal as counsel for Defendants Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC and Warner Music Group Corp. is granted, and the appearance of Ms. Segal is withdrawn as of the date of this Order. Attorney Sarah L Segal terminated. (Signed by United States Circuit Judge Sitting by Designation Alison J. Nathan on 4/1/2022) (vfr)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Sarah L. Segal to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah L. Segal, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Segal, Sarah)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Santora on behalf of Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Santora, Nicole)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for #41 MOTION for Deborah Susan Mallgrave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. (vba)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #41 MOTION for Deborah Susan Mallgrave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25862498..(Greenberg, Alan)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #41 MOTION for Deborah Susan Mallgrave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (vba)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Deborah Susan Mallgrave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of DSM in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing of Deborah Susan Mallgrave, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 3/15/2022 (vba).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/10/2022) (ate)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Elektra Entertainment Group Inc. answer due 4/4/2022; Warner Communications LLC answer due 4/4/2022; Warner Music Group Corp. answer due 4/4/2022. (ate)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian C. Ascher dated March 9, 2022. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #38 MOTION for Deborah Susan Mallgrave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not accept certificates from a state bar registrar;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Deborah Susan Mallgrave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Deborah Susan Mallgrave in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing of Deborah Susan Mallgrave, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 3/9/2022 (bcu).
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #37 Proposed Order, #36 MOTION for Deborah Susan Mallgrave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order Please attach Order to the Motion as an Exhibit.Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015. Related Document Number: #36 ..(Greenberg, Alan) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 3/8/2022 (wb).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Deborah Susan Mallgrave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of DSM in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 3/8/2022 (wb).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does 1-5, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., James Euringer, Joseph J. Galus, Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Alan A. Greenberg dated February 24, 2022 re: Amending Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER terminating #31 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. The Court will inform the parties if oral argument is requested. Otherwise, the motion will be decided on the papers in due course. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/15/2022) (vfr)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: On February 14, 2022, Defendants Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, and Warner Music Group Corp. filed a motion to dismiss. Pursuant to Rule 3.E. of this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, on or before February 24, 2022, Plaintiff must notify the Court and its adversary in writing whether (1) it intends to file an amended pleading and when it will do so or (2) it will rely on the pleading being attacked. Plaintiff is on notice that declining to amend its pleadings to timely respond to a fully briefed argument in the Defendants' February 14 motion to dismiss may well constitute a waiver of the Plaintiff's right to use the amendment process to cure any defects that have been made apparent by the Defendant's briefing. See F5 Cap. v. Pappas, 856 F.3d 61, 90 (2d Cir. 2017) (upholding denial of leave to amend where plaintiff had "an opportunity to amend in response to full briefing of the defendants' motion to dismiss"). If Plaintiff chooses to amend, Defendant may then (a) file an answer; (b) file a new motion to dismiss; or (c) submit a letter stating that it relies on the initially-filed motion to dismiss. Nothing in this Order alters the time to amend, answer or move provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or Local Rules. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/15/2022) (vfr)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on the Corporate Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian C. Ascher dated February 14, 2022. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Brian C. Ascher in Support re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Warner Music Group Corp. Entity Name History).(Ascher, Brian)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Charles Bernstein on behalf of Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Bernstein, Andrew)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah L Segal on behalf of Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Segal, Sarah)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is so redesignated. (vba)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #23 Letter, filed by Warner Communications LLC, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Music Group Corp. ENDORSEMENT: The Court grants the Corporate Defendants permission to move to dismiss the claims against them. A pre-hearing conference is not required. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/28/2022) (vfr)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Brian C. Ascher dated January 31, 2022 re: Briefing on Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian C. Ascher dated January 27, 2022 re: pre-motion letter for anticipated motion to dismiss. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for Warner Communications LLC. Document filed by Warner Communications LLC..(Ascher, Brian)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Scott A. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-25620845. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Scott A. Edelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number CNYSDC-25620845. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott A. Edelman, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Edelman, Scott)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian C. Ascher dated January 12, 2022. The application is granted. Elektra Entertainment Group Inc. answer due 1/27/2022; Warner Communications LLC answer due 1/27/2022; Warner Music Group Corp. answer due 1/27/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/12/2022) (vfr)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian C. Ascher dated January 12, 2022. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Warner Communications LLC served on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Warner Music Group Corp. served on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Elektra Entertainment Group Inc. served on 11/8/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya, Agent for Service of Process. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Joseph J. Galus served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. Service was accepted by Joseph J. Galus, Defendant. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian C. Ascher dated November 22, 2021. The application is granted. So Ordered. Elektra Entertainment Group Inc. answer due 1/13/2022; Warner Communications LLC answer due 1/13/2022; Warner Music Group Corp. answer due 1/13/2022 (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/22/2021) (js)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Brian C. Ascher dated November 22, 2021. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Communications LLC, Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Craig Ascher on behalf of Warner Communications LLC..(Ascher, Brian)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Alan Asher Greenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons requests must be linked to a corresponding pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Warner Music Group Corp., re: Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 8/31/2021 (jgo).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Warner Communications LLC, re: Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 8/31/2021 (jgo).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Euringer, re: Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 8/31/2021 (jgo).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., re: Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 8/31/2021 (jgo).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph J. Galus, re: Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan) Modified on 8/31/2021 (jgo).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Jane Doe 7015.(Greenberg, Alan)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Asher Greenberg on behalf of Jane Doe 7015..(Greenberg, Alan)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 1) Notice of Removal (with Exhibit A), dated August 15, 2021; 2) Civil Cover Sheet, dated August 15, 2021; 3) Defendants Elektra Entertainment Group Inc. and Warner Music Group Corp.'s Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, dated August 15, 2021; 4) SDNY Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions; 5) District Judge Edgardo Ramos's Individual Practices; and 6) Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox's Individual Rules of Practice served on Plaintiff Jane Doe 7015 on August 16, 2021. Service was made by overnight mail. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (gp)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.; Other Affiliate AI Entertainment Holdings LLC for Warner Music Group Corp.. Document filed by Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Music Group Corp...(Ascher, Brian)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ascher, Brian)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 951050/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24934610).Document filed by Warner Music Group Corp., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons and Complaint).(Ascher, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe 7015 v. Elektra Entertainment Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 7015
Represented By: Alan Asher Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.
Represented By: Brian Craig Ascher
Represented By: Scott A Edelman
Represented By: Andrew Charles Bernstein
Represented By: Sarah L Segal
Represented By: Nicole Santora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Communications LLC
Represented By: Brian Craig Ascher
Represented By: Scott A Edelman
Represented By: Andrew Charles Bernstein
Represented By: Sarah L Segal
Represented By: Nicole Santora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group Corp.
Represented By: Brian Craig Ascher
Represented By: Scott A Edelman
Represented By: Andrew Charles Bernstein
Represented By: Sarah L Segal
Represented By: Nicole Santora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Euringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Galus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?