Ogelton et al v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Calwayne Ogelton and Richard Whint
Defendant: THE CITY OF NEW YORK, NYC Department of Buildings and Melanie E. La Rocca
Case Number: 1:2021cv06889
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Pretrial Conference is adjourned to December 7, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The dial in information is (866) 390-1828, access code 1582687. Proposed Case Management Plan due December 1, 2021.See ECF 7 for further instructions.(HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang)(Text Only Order)(rlf)
October 12, 2021 Filing 17 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Defendants write to respectfully request that the Court adjourn the initial conference, currently scheduled for November 4, 2021, until a date after Defendants have filed their response to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Elisheva L. Rosen dated October 12, 2021. Document filed by Melanie E. La Rocca, NYC Department of Buildings, The City of New York..(Rosen, Elisheva)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER terminating #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. See ECF 15. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang)(Text Only Order) (rlf)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to the Complaint is due November 29, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang)(Text Only Order) (rlf)
September 17, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time respectfully respond to opposing counsel's opposition to, and to clarify, Defendants request for a sixty (60) day extension addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Elisheva L. Rosen dated September 17, 2021. Document filed by Melanie E. La Rocca, NYC Department of Buildings, The City of New York. (Attachments: #1 DOB Confirming Electronic Service of Summons and Complaint, #2 Email Exchange Regarding Extension Request).(Rosen, Elisheva)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Daniel Needham dated 9/16/2021 re: Defendants Request for Extension of Time to Respond. Document filed by Calwayne Ogelton, Richard Whint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - July 23, 2021 letter from counsel).(Needham, Daniel)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respectfully request a sixty (60) day extension of time, from September 28, 2021 (as per ECF Doc Nos. 9-11) to November 27, 2021, for Defendants to respond to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Elisheva L. Rosen dated September 13, 2021. Document filed by Melanie E. La Rocca, NYC Department of Buildings, The City of New York..(Rosen, Elisheva)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Melanie E. La Rocca served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. Service was accepted by VICTORIA VELEZ. Document filed by Calwayne Ogelton; Richard Whint..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. NYC Department of Buildings served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. Service was accepted by VICTORIA VELEZ. Document filed by Calwayne Ogelton; Richard Whint..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The City of New York served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. Service was accepted by BETY MYZACK. Document filed by Calwayne Ogelton; Richard Whint..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elisheva Leah Rosen on behalf of Melanie E. La Rocca, NYC Department of Buildings, The City of New York..(Rosen, Elisheva)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held telephonically on Thursday, November 04, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. The dial in information is (866) 3901828, access code 1582687. (Initial Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 9/8/2021) (rro)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Christian Needham on behalf of Calwayne Ogelton, Richard Whint..(Needham, Daniel)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/18/2021) (kv)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Melanie E. La Rocca, NYC Department of Buildings, The City of New York.(vf)
August 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Onyuwoma Williams Igbokwe. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act; the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf)
August 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Onyuwoma Williams Igbokwe. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Calwayne Ogelton, Richard Whint, CITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (vf)
August 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, New York City Department of Buildings, and Melanie E. La Rocca, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Calwayne Ogelton, Richard Whint..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melanie E. La Rocca, NYC Department of Buildings, The City of New York. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24939018)Document filed by Calwayne Ogelton, Richard Whint..(Igbokwe, Onyuwoma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogelton et al v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calwayne Ogelton
Represented By: Onyuwoma Williams Igbokwe
Represented By: Daniel Christian Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Whint
Represented By: Onyuwoma Williams Igbokwe
Represented By: Daniel Christian Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Department of Buildings
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie E. La Rocca
Represented By: Elisheva Leah Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?