Global Tech Industries Group Inc. v. Wells
Plaintiff: Global Tech Industries Inc and Global Tech Industries Group Inc.
Defendant: David Wells
Case Number: 1:2021cv06891
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ds
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Teri T. Pham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Wells. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Teri T. Pham in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Carlin, Larry)
October 14, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for Teri T. Pham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25191469. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Teri T. Pham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25191469. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Wells. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Carlin, Larry) Modified on 10/14/2021 (wb).
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Teri Pham dated October 11, 2021 re: Request for a Pre-Motion Conference in connection with a Proposed Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by David Wells..(Carlin, Larry)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Global Tech Industries Group Inc...(Markowitz, Warren)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. David Wells served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Global Tech Industries Group Inc...(Markowitz, Warren)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
August 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Global Tech Industries Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit notarized affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, #3 Exhibit NYS - Cert of Good Standing).(Markowitz, Warren)
August 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Suprme Court of Colorado;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Global Tech Industries Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit notarized affidavit, #2 Exhibit USDC_C0- Cert of good standing, #3 Exhibit NYS - Cert of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order proposed order).(Markowitz, Warren) Modified on 8/19/2021 (wb).
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Wells..(gp)
August 18, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Suprme Court of Colorado; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Wells, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Global Tech Industries Group Inc...(Markowitz, Warren)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Markowitz, Warren)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against David Wells. Document filed by Global Tech Industries Group Inc...(Markowitz, Warren)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Global Tech Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attys affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, #3 Exhibit nys cert if good staning, #4 Exhibit USDC Colorado status report).(Markowitz, Warren) Modified on 8/18/2021 (wb).
August 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Warren Ross Markowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 17, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #3 AMENDED MOTION to Amend/Correct ... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the motion;. Re-file the motion using the event type Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice found under the event list Motions - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
August 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Warren Ross Markowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
August 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Warren Ross Markowitz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Global Tech Industries Inc., David Wells. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted, party name was entered incorrectly. (vf)
August 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AMENDED MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Global Tech Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement certificate of Good Standing NYS, #2 Affidavit notarized affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order order for pro hac).(Markowitz, Warren) Modified on 8/17/2021 (wb).
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24939691. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Global Tech Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit notarized affidavit).(Markowitz, Warren) Modified on 8/16/2021 (wb).
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against Global Tech Industries Inc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24939296)Document filed by Global Tech Industries Inc..(Markowitz, Warren) Modified on 8/17/2021 (vf).
August 16, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #2 FIRST MOTION for Warren Ross Markowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24939691. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Suprme Court of Colorado; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Tech Industries Group Inc. v. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Tech Industries Inc
Represented By: Warren Ross Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Tech Industries Group Inc.
Represented By: Warren Ross Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?