Mauleon v. Jan et al
Plaintiff: Yolanda Mauleon
Defendant: Jan G. Eggers and Fastlane Motorcycle Rentals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv06893
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 tt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. [If all parties consent, the remaining paragraphs need not be completed.] This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. All counsel must meet face-to-face for at least one hour to discuss settlement within fourteen (14) days following the close of fact discovery. The use of any alternative dispute resolution mechanism does not stay or modify any date in this Order. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is three (3) days. By January 17, 2022, the parties shall submit a joint letter indicating the anticipated schedule of their private mediation. The parties are directed to file a joint status report not later than one week in advance of the Case Management Conference. The parties should indicate whether they anticipate filing motion(s) for summary judgment and whether they believe the case should be referred to a Magistrate Judge for settlement discussions. The parties are reminded that, pursuant to paragraph 8, a pre-motion conference request for any motion for summary judgment must be made within fourteen (14) days of the close of fact discovery. This ORDER may not be modified or the dates herein extended, except by further order of this Court for good cause shown. Any application to modify or extend the dates herein (except as noted in paragraph 6) shall be made in a written application in accordance with paragraph l.B. of the Court's Individual Practices and shall be made no less than five (5) days prior to the expiration of the date sought to be extended. So Ordered Deposition due by 11/30/2021. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2022. Expert Discovery due by 3/10/2022. Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 10:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/28/2021) (js)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jan G. Eggers, Fastlane Motorcycle Rentals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Lavroff, Jay)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Yolanda Mauleon.(Hovsepyan, Victoria)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Victoria Hovsepyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (if)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 30, 2021, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/25/2021) (kv)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/25/2021) (kv)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/25/2021) (kv)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Jan G. Eggers, Fastlane Motorcycle Rentals, LLC..(Lavroff, Jay)
August 23, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #4 MOTION for Victoria Hovsepyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-24964828. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Victoria Hovsepyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-24964828. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Yolanda Mauleon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Hovsepyan, Victoria)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jan G. Eggers, Fastlane Motorcycle Rentals, LLC..(Lavroff, Jay)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lavroff, Jay)
August 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jay Lavroff. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 806170/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24939761).Document filed by Jan G. Eggers, Fastlane Motorcycle Rentals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Lavroff, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauleon v. Jan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Mauleon
Represented By: Victoria Hovsepyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan G. Eggers
Represented By: Jay Lavroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastlane Motorcycle Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Jay Lavroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?