Brown County Publishing Company, Inc. et al v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brown County Publishing Company Inc and Multi Media Channels LLC
Defendant: Google LLC and Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06915
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Ceremonial Courtroom 9C is set as an overflow courtroom. Remote telephone information is provided below: Dial in: 1 888-363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
August 30, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 30, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number: 1:21-cv-00498. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received.
August 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
August 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
August 30, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq)
August 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(laq)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER (MDL 3010) transferring this action to USDC-Southern District of New York for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. (cc: all counsel)(tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
August 16, 2021 Case Electronically Transmitted to USDC-Southern District of New York on 8/16/2021. (tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Stipulation filed by Facebook Inc signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/23/21. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint 21 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves Googles April 30, 2021 Motion for Transfer of Actions to the Northern District of California, or if the Transfer Motion is granted, until the date by which the transferee judge orders Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the operative Complaint, whichever is later. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Facebook Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Google Defendants' Motion for Transfer of Actions, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Orsini, Kevin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Facebook Inc. (Orsini, Kevin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Facebook Inc - Waiver sent on 4/29/2021. (Mitchell, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Google LLC - Waiver sent on 4/29/2021. (Mitchell, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Mitchell on behalf of Brown County Publishing Company Inc, Multi Media Channels LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: David W. Mitchell (Mitchell, David) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Brown County Publishing Company, Inc., Multi Media Channels, LLC.(Dickinson, Erin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
April 20, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc, Google LLC. (tlf) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Brown County Publishing Company, Inc., Multi Media Channels, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3796080) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Facebook Inc, #3 Summons Google LLC)(Dickinson, Erin) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown County Publishing Company, Inc. et al v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown County Publishing Company Inc
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Erin K Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multi Media Channels LLC
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Erin K Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Orsini
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?