Muralieva et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva and Timurhan Kekec
Defendant: Secretary, DHS Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick Garland, District Director THOMAS CIOPPA, Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Director Christopher A. Wray, Alejandro Mayorkas, Thomas Cioppa, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Christopher A. Wray
Case Number: 1:2021cv06926
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Thomas Cioppa, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray. Document filed by Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva, Timurhan Kekec. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Fooksman, Marina)
September 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 10-5-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:00 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/20/2021) (kv)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher A. Wray..(jgo)
August 19, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher A. Wray, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Timurhan Kekec, Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva..(Fooksman, Marina)
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (sj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Cioppa. (sj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrick Garland. (sj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (sj)
August 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marina Fooksman to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant's name as to whom the summons request is for must match exactly as pleading on PDF and docket entry. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher Wray, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Timurhan Kekec, Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva..(Fooksman, Marina) Modified on 8/19/2021 (sj).
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Timurhan Kekec, Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva..(Fooksman, Marina)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Cioppa, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Timurhan Kekec, Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva..(Fooksman, Marina)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick Garland, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Timurhan Kekec, Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva..(Fooksman, Marina)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Timurhan Kekec, Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva..(Fooksman, Marina)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fooksman, Marina)
August 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marina Fooksman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (vf)
August 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marina Fooksman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: THOMAS CIOPPA, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (vf)
August 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Marina Fooksman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Marina Fooksman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Each Summons request must be filed as its own separate event. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas; Merrick Garland; Thomas Cioppa; Ur Mendoza Jaddou; Christopher A. Wray, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Timurhan Kekec, Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva..(Fooksman, Marina) Modified on 8/18/2021 (vf).
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Thomas Cioppa , Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24945214).Document filed by Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva, Timurhan Kekec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits for Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Fooksman, Marina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muralieva et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakhat Kurmanbekovna Muralieva
Represented By: Marina Fooksman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timurhan Kekec
Represented By: Marina Fooksman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, DHS Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director THOMAS CIOPPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cioppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?