3A Composites USA Inc. v. Livingston International Inc.
Counter Defendant: 3A Composites USA Inc.
Counter Claimant: Livingston International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv06939
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY re: #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . Document filed by 3A Composites USA Inc...(Tenenbaum, Alan)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by October 22, 2021, the parties submit a joint letter,not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: As set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties also jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Broderick. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with Section 13.1 of the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/29/2021) (ama)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against 3A Composites USA Inc.. Document filed by Livingston International Inc...(Richman, Steven)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent L.I.I. Holdings U.S., Other Affiliate Longitude Holding III Limited for Livingston International Inc.. Document filed by Livingston International Inc...(Richman, Steven)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Lee Weyman on behalf of 3A Composites USA Inc...(Weyman, Mark)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Bouskila on behalf of 3A Composites USA Inc...(Bouskila, Sarah)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Mark Richman on behalf of Livingston International Inc...(Richman, Steven)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Livingston International Inc. served on 8/25/2021, answer due 9/15/2021. Service was accepted by Phoebe Omolo. Document filed by 3A Composites USA Inc...(Bouskila, Sarah)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Schweiter Technologies AG, Other Affiliate 3A Composites Holding AG for 3A Composites USA Inc.. Document filed by 3A Composites USA Inc...(Tenenbaum, Alan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Livingston International Inc. (vf)
August 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Alan Tenenbaum to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NAME SPELLED INCORRECTLY. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
August 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alan Tenenbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 10,000,000; County code Erie. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
August 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Livingston International Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by 3A Composites USA Inc...(Tenenbaum, Alan)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NAME SPELLED INCORRECTLY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate 31 Composites Holding AG, Other Affiliate Schweiter Technologies AG for 3A Composites USA Inc.. Document filed by 3A Composites USA Inc...(Tenenbaum, Alan) Modified on 8/18/2021 (lb).
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tenenbaum, Alan)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Livingston International Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24947063)Document filed by 3A Composites USA Inc...(Tenenbaum, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3A Composites USA Inc. v. Livingston International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: 3A Composites USA Inc.
Represented By: Alan Tenenbaum
Represented By: Mark Lee Weyman
Represented By: Sarah Bouskila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Livingston International Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?