DING v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: Xue Ding
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv06952
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/8/2021) (js)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud..(Byars, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud..(Byars, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/20/2021) (jca)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia; Case Number: 1:21-cv-01540. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of New York pursuant to Order on Motion to Transfer Case,, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]
August 18, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 18, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 18, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 18, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 9, 2021 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 8/16/2021. (zjth) Modified on 8/9/2021 (zjth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]
August 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 8/18/2021. (zjth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]
August 9, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The Transfer Deadline of 8/16/2021 was entered in error by the Court and the correct transfer date will be re-entered by the Court. (zjth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]
August 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent Motion to Transfer Case #3 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended through, and including, the latter of (i) 21 days after this action is docketed in the transferee district, or (ii) August 16, 2021, the current deadline for Defendants' response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/8/21. (DJS) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the Southern District of New York by MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD. (Moustakas, John). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 8/10/2021 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against MERRICK B. GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8510082) filed by XUE DING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit INDEX OF EXHIBITS, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT DQ, #6 Summons SUMMONS ATT GEN, #7 Summons SUMMONS MAYORKAS, #8 Summons SUMMONS RENAUD, #9 Summons SUMMONS US ATT, #10 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER)(Jeelani, Hashim) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/18/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DING v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xue Ding
Represented By: Hashim G. Jeelani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: John Moustakas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: John Moustakas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: John Moustakas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?