First on First Deli et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: First on First Deli and Yasin Algabyali
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv06965
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 202
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Schwartz on behalf of United States of America..(Schwartz, Tara)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sj)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yasin Algabyali, First on First Deli..(Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America. Document filed by First on First Deli, Yasin Algabyali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Final Agency Decision).(Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
August 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Blank; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 07:2023(a) Judicial Review of Food Stamp Disqualification; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
August 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 19, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-24952726, paid on 8/18/2021..(vf)
August 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 8/24/2021. (vf)
August 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First on First Deli et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First on First Deli
Represented By: Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasin Algabyali
Represented By: Jeremy Graham Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tara Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?