In re Google Digital Advertising Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Surefreight Global LLC, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Michael Devaney, Nicholas Arrieta, Sara Yberra, Michael Stellman, Vitor Lindo, Mark J. Astarita, Organic Panaceas, LLC and Sweepstakes Today, LLC
Defendant: Google LLC and Alphabet Inc.
Interested Party: The Nation Company, L.P., Genius Media Group, Inc., The Progressive, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc. and Kimberly Negron
Case Number: 1:2021cv07001
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 161 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 12, 2021 Filing 160 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Ceremonial Courtroom 9C is set as an overflow courtroom. Remote telephone information is provided below: Dial in: 1 888-363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
August 19, 2021 Filing 158 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 5:20-cv-03556. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 19, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Southern District of New York per MDL Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 19, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 19, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 10, 2021 Filing 157 MDL TRANSFER ORDER,MDL No. 3010. Transfer of IN RE GOOGLE DITIGAL ADVERTISING ANTITRUST LITIGATION, NDCA NO. 5:20-03556 and IN RE GOOGLE DIGITAL PUBLISHER ANTITRUST LITIGATION, NDCA NO. 5:20-08984 to Southern District of New York. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXPERT PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/24/2021.Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-03556-BLF, 5:20-cv-08984-BLF(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Expert Protocol filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 153 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/10/21, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (86 in 5:20-cv-08984-BLF) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2021. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 152 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/10/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Elias, Jordan) (Filed on 6/11/2021) Transcriber: Access Transcripts. Modified on 6/11/2021 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 151 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/10/21, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ilene Watson, telephone number 855-873-2223. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2021. (imw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/10/2021. FTR Time: 11:28 - 11:49. Plaintiff Attorney: Rachel Johnson, Jordan Elis, Scott Grzenczyk, Caitlin, Coslett, Philip Korologos, Carol O'Keefe, via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Justina Sessions, Jonathan Jacobson via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/10/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/10/2021) Transcriber: Access Transcripts. Modified on 6/10/2021 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING #147 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/8/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Filing 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Elias)(Elias, Jordan) (Filed on 6/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 146 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties wh o wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 8, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 145 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT / Joint Proposed Agenda for June 10, 2021 Case Management Conference filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING #129 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT TO PSC WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/18/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING #66 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 141 Statement re #139 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Plaintiff's Statement in Support of Consolidation by Organic Panaceas, LLC. (Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 5/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 12, 2021 Filing 140 Statement re #139 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF CONSOLIDATION by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 5/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RELATING CASES AND TO SHOW CAUSE ON CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/5/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 138 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC re #62 Response ( Non Motion ) Notice re Filing MDL Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion, #2 Exhibit Brief)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 4/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 28, 2021 Filing 137 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Case No. 21-cv-02629 to Master File No. 5:20-cv-03556-BLF filed by Organic Panaceas, LLC. Responses due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of D. McCorvey, #2 Proposed Order)(Gregory, Philip) (Filed on 4/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF IN 21-CV-2629 TO FILE RELATION MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 135 MODIFIED PROTOCOL FOR INTERIM CLASS COUNSELS TIME AND EXPENSE SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER ESTABLISHING A PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY COORDINATION COMMITTEE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/8/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/8/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Sterling International Consulting Group, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 4/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 130 NOTICE by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC Regarding Advertising Plaintiffs' Proposal Concerning Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order Regarding Appointment of Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Regarding Discovery Coordination Committee, #3 Exhibit C- Protocol for Interim Class Counsels Time and Expense Submission)(Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 129 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application of Derriel McCorvey for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by Organic Panaceas, LLC. (McCorvey, Derriel) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/08/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Sweepstakes Today, LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Mitchell, David) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 4/8/2021. Total Time in Court: 9:14 - 10:45 (1 Hour 31 Minutes). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Dena Sharp, Jordan Elias, Tina Wolfson, Rachel Johnson via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Justina Sessions, Jonathan Jacobson, Mara Boundy via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/8/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Mark J. Astarita, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 4/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 8, 2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 4/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2021.Oral argument heard. The Court takes the matter under submission, written order to be issued. Total Time in Court: 9:42 - 10:24 (41 Minutes). Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Rachel Johnson, Dena Sharp, David Mitchell, Steve Jodlowski, Caitlin Cossett, Abby Dennis, Carol O'Keefe, Tina Wolfson via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Justina sessions via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 123 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 4/8/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 6, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/1/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Sterling International Consulting Group, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 4/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/1/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Filing 120 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/01/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 4/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 119 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/01/2021, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (118 in 5:20-cv-03556-BLF) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2021. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/01/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Vitor Lindo, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 4/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Filing 117 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #103 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #102 MOTION to Appoint Counsel ) Reply Re Motion for Lead Counsel filed byVitor Lindo. (Johnson, Rachel) (Filed on 3/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Filing 116 REPLY (re #66 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 3/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 115 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING. Motion Hearing as to #103 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #102 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #101 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel .Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 30, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/10/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Filing 113 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mark J. Astarita, Genius Media Group, Inc., JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. and Google Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Filer's Attestation re Signatures)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 3/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING #111 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/4/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 3, 2021 Filing 111 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15652263.) filed by Michael Devaney, Vitor Lindo, Michael Stellman, Sara Yberra. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ferich, Andrew) (Filed on 3/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 3, 2021 Set Deadlines: re #109 Order Resetting Case Management Conference.Case Management Statement due by 6/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY RELATED PUBLISHER CASES SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JUNE 10, 2021 AT 11AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING #88 MOTION TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) Modified on 3/2/2021 (blflc4S, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING #98 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING #99 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING #100 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 104 Renotice motion hearing re #101 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byGenius Media Group, Inc., JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Filer's Attestation re Signatures)(Related document(s) #101 ) (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 3/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 103 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Nicholas Arrieta, Michael Devaney, Vitor Lindo, Michael Stellman, Sara Yberra. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 3/11/2021. Replies due by 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tina Wolfson and Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Rachel) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 102 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Mark J. Astarita, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 3/11/2021. Replies due by 3/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip C. Korologos, #2 Exhibit 1 to Korologos Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Korologos Decl., #4 Declaration of George A. Zelcs, #5 Exhibit 1 to Zelcs Decl., #6 Exhibit 2 to Zelcs Decl., #7 Declaration of Eric L. Cramer, #8 Exhibit 1 to Cramer Decl., #9 Exhibit 2 to Cramer Decl., #10 Declaration of Robert J. Gralewski, Jr., #11 Exhibit 1 to Gralewski Decl., #12 Declaration of Dennis Stewart, #13 Exhibit 1 to Stewart Decl., #14 Proposed Order, #15 Affidavit Filer's Attestation re: Signatures)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15625515.) filed by Mark J. Astarita, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing)(Tamoshunas, Archana) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15625490.) filed by Mark J. Astarita, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing)(Lambert, April) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15625219.) filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC, Mark J. Astarita. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Standing)(Radice, John) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Renee Johnson for Plaintiffs Vitor Lindo, Michael Stellman, Michael Devaney, Sara Yberra (Johnson, Rachel) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING #95 STIPULATION REGARDING COMPLAINT RESPONSE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/23/2021.Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-03556-BLF, 5:20-cv-04130-BLF, 5:20-cv-08984-BLF, 5:20-cv-09092-BLF, 5:20-cv-09321-BLF, 5:21-cv-00022-BLF(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT RESPONSE DEADLINES filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 2/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 94 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #88 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Case Negron v. Google LLC ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 2/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 15, 2021 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #66 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byHanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Elias, Jordan) (Filed on 2/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/04/21 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Stewart, Dennis) (Filed on 2/11/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 91 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS #76 #79 TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 88 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relate Case Negron v. Google LLC filed by Kimberly Negron. Responses due by 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Isquith and Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Markert, Pamela) (Filed on 2/9/2021)[Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 87 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #79 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 86 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #76 MOTION to Relate Case Interested Party's Unopposed Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/04/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Nicholas Arrieta, Michael Devaney, Sara Yberra, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 84 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/04/2021, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (41 in 5:20-cv-08984-BLF) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 4, 2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/04/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Sterling International Consulting Group, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/4/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Case Management Conference held on 2/4/2021.Total Time in Court: 52 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Christina C. Sharp, Adam E. Polk, Tina Wolfson, David W. Mitchell, Sophia Marie Rios, Robert J. Gralewski, Jr., Philip C. Korologos via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: John Edward Schmidtlein via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dennis Stewart, #2 Exhibit Mikula Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Dennis) (Filed on 2/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER INVITING PLAINTIFF IN 21-CV-748 TO FEBRUARY 4, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/3/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Kahn Sessions for Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 2/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 76 MOTION to Relate Case Interested Party's Unopposed Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Gralewski Jr., #2 Exhibit A - JLaSalle Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Relate)(Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 2/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jacobson for Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 74 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 3, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no docu ment associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 73 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 72 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT PUBLISHER PLAINTIFFS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 1/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 71 Statement Regarding Consolidation by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR FEBRUARY 4, 2021 AT 10AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Set Case Management Conference re #70 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - To be determined. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO RELATE AT ECF #55 , #57 , #61 , #64 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/21/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Filing 67 RESPONSE re #54 Notice (Other), #62 Response ( Non Motion ) Defendants' Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 2/15/2021. Replies due by 3/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael Kreins, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byHanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION to Relate Case UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 63 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed bySterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 1/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 62 RESPONSE re #54 Notice (Other) Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin M. Greenblum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 60 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #57 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byGenius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 59 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed bySweepstakes Today, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven M. Jodlowski, #2 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, Inform Inc. v. Google LLC, et al., No. 1:19-cv-05362-JPB (N.D. Ga. Jan. 22, 2020), ECF No. 16-1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff J. Jackson Paige's Motion for Transfer and Consolidation Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, In re Google Inc., Antitrust Litig., MDL No. 2981 (Nov. 27, 2020), ECF No. 36, #4 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Response in Opposition to Amos Kober's Administrative Motion to Relate Cases, In re Google Play Consumer Antitrust Litig., No. 20-cv-05761-JD (N.D. Cal. Dec. 14, 2020), ECF No. 127, #5 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, David) (Filed on 12/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 58 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION to Relate Case , #57 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byHanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Relate Case re 20-cv-09092-DMR filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin M. Greenblum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 12/22/2020) Modified on 12/23/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 56 Proposed Order re #55 MOTION to Relate Case by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 12/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Relate Case re 20-cv- 08984-LB filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benjamin M. Greenblum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 12/22/2020) Modified on 12/23/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE by Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Surefreight Global LLC of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING #42 MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/8/2020.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. Filed byVitor Lindo, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY (re #42 MOTION to Stay Discovery ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 12/4/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tina Wolfson (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 12/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Eric Stiner (Stiner, Christopher) (Filed on 12/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Address by Theodore Walter Maya (Maya, Theodore) (Filed on 12/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #45 STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO AMEND THEIR COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/30/2020.(blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) Modified on 11/30/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #44 STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/30/2020. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
November 27, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Deadline To Amend Their Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Greenblum, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendants' Deadline To File Their Reply in Support of Their Motion To Stay Discovery filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Greenblum, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 43 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION to Stay Discovery ) filed byMichael Devaney, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Michael Stellman, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/23/2020. Replies due by 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 11/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 12/24/2020. Replies due by 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael Kreins, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 11/9/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF GRAND ATLAS LLC D/B/A GRAND ATLAS TOURS. Singed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman ON 10/22/2020. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grand Atlas Tours (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DECLINING TO RULE ON EARLY DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/20/2020. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 37 Statement regarding Early Discovery by Michael Devaney, Grand Atlas Tours, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Vitor Lindo, Michael Stellman, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 36 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 24, 2020, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #33 Transcript Order, #34 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2020. (Related documents(s) #33 , #34 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. Filed byHanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC, Grand Atlas Tours, Michael Devaney, Michael Stellman, Vitor Lindo. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/24/2020 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Greenblum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/25/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/24/2020 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Nicholas Arrieta, Michael Devaney, Grand Atlas Tours, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC, Sara Yberra, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/25/2020) (Transcriber: Belle Ball) Modified on 9/25/2020 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/24/2020.No Trial Dates set at this time.FTR Time: 11:19 - 11:48. Plaintiff Attorney: Dena Sharp, Jordan Elias, Tina Wolfson via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Benjamin Greenblum via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #28 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/21/2020. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 9/24/2020 TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 16, 2020 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/.(tshS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Nicholas Arrieta, Michael Devaney, Grand Atlas Tours, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC, Sara Yberra. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin M. Greenblum for Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14954962.) filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Greenblum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Kramer for Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 9/17/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JOINT STIPULATION #25 AND ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION ANDSETTING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2020. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-03556-BLF, 5:20-cv-04130-BLF(blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Consolidation and Setting Deadlines filed by Grand Atlas Tours, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RELATING CASES (granting #23 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/21/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. Responses due by 7/24/2020. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 7/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION #19 REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/24/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Schmidtlein (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Deadline To Respond to the Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grand Atlas Tours, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. Alphabet Inc. served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grand Atlas Tours, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. Google LLC served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 ***CLERK ERROR, INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED, SEE DKT. #15 ***ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020) Modified on 6/11/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Grand Atlas Tours, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/10/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Surefreight Global LLC (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Surefreight Global LLC identifying Other Affiliate Solomon Noonan, Other Affiliate Bradley Noonan for Surefreight Global LLC. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hanson Law Firm, PC (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hanson Law Firm, PC (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Atlas Tours (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Grand Atlas Tours identifying Other Affiliate Grand Atlas Tours, Other Affiliate Eric Lewis, Other Affiliate Flannery Wasson for Grand Atlas Tours. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/10/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/27/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14511885.). Filed by Grand Atlas Tours, Hanson Law Firm, PC, Surefreight Global LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Google Digital Advertising Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surefreight Global LLC
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: Jordan S. Elias
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: April D Lambert
Represented By: Archana Tamoshunas
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: John D. Radice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanson Law Firm, PC
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: Jordan S. Elias
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: April D Lambert
Represented By: Archana Tamoshunas
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Represented By: John D. Radice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Devaney
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Andrew William Ferich
Represented By: Christopher Eric Stiner
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Represented By: Theodore W. Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Arrieta
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Christopher Eric Stiner
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Represented By: Theodore W. Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Yberra
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Andrew William Ferich
Represented By: Christopher Eric Stiner
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Represented By: Theodore Walter Maya
Represented By: Theodore W. Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stellman
Represented By: Andrew William Ferich
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vitor Lindo
Represented By: Andrew William Ferich
Represented By: Jordan S. Elias
Represented By: Rachel Renee Johnson
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark J. Astarita
Represented By: April D Lambert
Represented By: Archana Tamoshunas
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: John Daniel Radice
Represented By: John D. Radice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Panaceas, LLC
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Derriel Carlton McCorvey
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweepstakes Today, LLC
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: Benjamin M. Greenblum
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Nation Company, L.P.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Genius Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Progressive, Inc.
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sterling International Consulting Group
Represented By: Sophia Marie Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: Robert Gralewski, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kimberly Negron
Represented By: Pamela A. Markert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?