Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd. v. Tantleff et al
Plaintiff: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd.
Defendant: Adam B. Tantleff, Board of Managers of 220 Riverside Boulevard at Trump Place Condominium and Pale Horse Realty, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv07002
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Pale Horse Realty, LLC served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021. Document filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd...(Weinreb, Alan)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pale Horse Realty, LLC. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Board of Managers of 220 Riverside Boulevard at Trump Place Condominium. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adam B. Tantleff. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pale Horse Realty, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd...(Weinreb, Alan)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Board of Managers of 220 Riverside Boulevard at Trump Place Condominium, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd...(Weinreb, Alan)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Adam B. Tantleff, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd...(Weinreb, Alan)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Weinreb, Alan)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 OATH of Alan H. Weinreb, Esq. Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b and Section Nine-X of the Banking Law. Document filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd...(Weinreb, Alan)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd...(Weinreb, Alan)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Managers of 220 Riverside Boulevard at Trump Place Condominium, Pale Horse Realty, LLC, Adam B. Tantleff. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24957478)Document filed by Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit G, #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice).(Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd. v. Tantleff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Mountain Holdings (Cayman) Ltd.
Represented By: Alan H. Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam B. Tantleff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Managers of 220 Riverside Boulevard at Trump Place Condominium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pale Horse Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?