In re Google Digital Publisher Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., The Progressive, Inc, Sterling International Consulting Group, Mark J. Astarita, JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC and Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Google L.L.C, Alphabet Inc. and Youtube L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv07034
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 12, 2021 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
August 20, 2021 Filing 95 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 5:20-cv-08984. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Southern District of New York per MDL Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021) Modified on 8/19/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 94 MDL TRANSFER ORDER,MDL No. 3010. Transfer of IN RE GOOGLE DITIGAL ADVERTISING ANTITRUST LITIGATION, NDCA NO. 5:20-03556 and IN RE GOOGLE DIGITAL PUBLISHER ANTITRUST LITIGATION, NDCA NO. 5:20-08984 to Southern District of New York. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sophia Marie Rios (Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 7/27/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #82 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byGenius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 7/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXPERT PROTOCOL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/24/2021.Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-03556-BLF, 5:20-cv-08984-BLF(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Expert Protocol) filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Coslett, Caitlin) (Filed on 6/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 89 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/10/21, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (86 in 5:20-cv-08984-BLF) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2021. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #87 STIPULATION ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/15/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Coslett, Caitlin) (Filed on 6/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/10/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Sterling International Consulting Group, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Coslett, Caitlin) (Filed on 6/14/2021)Transcriber: Belle Ball. Modified on 6/14/2021 (lmh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/10/2021. FTR Time: 11:28 - 11:49. Plaintiff Attorney: Rachel Johnson, Jordan Elis, Scott Grzenczyk, Caitlin, Coslett, Philip Korologos, Carol O'Keefe, via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: Justina Sessions, Jonathan Jacobson via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING #83 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/8/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021) Modified on 6/8/2021 (blflc4S, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 7, 2021 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16047554.) filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DC Certificate of Good Standing)(Wallenstein, Marc) (Filed on 6/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/18/2021. Replies due by 6/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 6/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 81 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties wh o wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 8, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
June 3, 2021 Filing 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT /Joint Proposed Agenda for June 10, 2021 Case Management Conference filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Coslett, Caitlin) (Filed on 6/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
May 10, 2021 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by JLaSalle Enterprises LLC (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
May 7, 2021 Filing 78 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mikula Web Solutions, Inc. for Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Nordin, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC Notice re Filing MDL Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion, #2 Exhibit Brief)(Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 4/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MODIFIED ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL FOR PUBLISHER CLASS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 75 MODIFIED PROTOCOL FOR INTERIM CLASS COUNSELS TIME AND EXPENSE SUBMISSIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ESTABLISHING A PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY COORDINATION COMMITTEE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #72 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/15/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15836743.) filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nordin, Daniel) (Filed on 4/14/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 71 Proposed Order [Proposed] Protocol for Interim Class Counsels Time and Expense Submissions by Mark J. Astarita, Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 70 Proposed Order Establishing A Plaintiffs Discovery Coordination Committee by Mark J. Astarita, Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE by Genius Media Group, Inc., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. REGARDING PUBLISHER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CO-LEAD PUBLISHER CLASS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 23(G)(3) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING #67 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/8/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Karen M. Lerner ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15801860.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/06/2021 filed by JLaSalle Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lerner, Karen) (Filed on 4/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Kahn Sessions Counsel for Defendants Google LLC, Alphabet Inc., and YouTube, LLC (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 4/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 6, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jacobson Counsel for Defendants Google LLC, Alphabet Inc., and YouTube, LLC (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/6/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. Filed byThe Progressive, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, Genius Media Group, Inc., Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 4/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 4/8/2021 to 6/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #60 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/23/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING #58 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/23/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15731708.) filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 NJ Certificate of Good Standing)(Nast, Dianne) (Filed on 3/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Filing 59 Brief Reply in Support of Application of Girard Sharp LLP for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel filed byMark J. Astarita. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 3/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.] Modified on 8/20/2021 (sjo).
March 16, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15705232.) filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Edelson, Marc) (Filed on 3/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING #56 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/16/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15701373.) filed by Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Grabar, Joshua) (Filed on 3/15/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Grzenczyk (Grzenczyk, Scott) (Filed on 3/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. Elias (Elias, Jordan) (Filed on 3/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Dena C. Sharp (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 3/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #50 STIPULATION REGARDING PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/12/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Filing 51 Brief in Opposition to Application of Girard Sharp LLP for Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel (Digital Advertising, Dkt. 102) filed byGenius Media Group, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. JLaSalle Enterprises LLC and Mikula Web Solutions, Inc. . (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 3/11/2021) Modified on 3/12/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.] Modified on 8/20/2021 (sjo).
March 11, 2021 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Attorneys' Pro Hac Vice Admissions filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., Sterling International Consulting Group, Sweepstakes Today, LLC, The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc. Mark Astarita, JLaSalle Enterprises LLC, Mikula Web Solutions, Inc., and defendants Google, YouTube, and Alphabet. (Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 3/11/2021) Modified on 3/12/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/10/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY RELATED PUBLISHER CASES SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #95 STIPULATION REGARDING COMPLAINT RESPONSE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/23/2021.Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-03556-BLF, 5:20-cv-04130-BLF, 5:20-cv-08984-BLF, 5:20-cv-09092-BLF, 5:20-cv-09321-BLF, 5:21-cv-00022-BLF(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/18/21.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice For Stuart A. Davidson ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15585731.) filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. (Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 2/17/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 42 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/04/2021, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (41 in 5:20-cv-08984-BLF) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/04/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Sweepstakes Today, LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Mitchell, David) (Filed on 2/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Case Management Conference held on 2/4/2021.Total Time in Court: 52 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: David W. Mitchell, Steven M. Jodlowski, John Christopher Herman via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: John Edward Schmidtlein, Sophia Marie Rios via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 39 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 3, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no docu ment associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 38 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Publisher Plaintiffs filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. (Mitchell, David) (Filed on 1/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 37 Statement Regarding Consolidation by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/28/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #29 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/26/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR FEBRUARY 4, 2021 AT 10AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings re Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Set Case Management Conference re #34 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - To be determined. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying #30 Administrative Motion For Earlier Hearing Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 30 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Earlier Hearing Date re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #27 Renotice motion hearing , MOTION for Hearing CORRECTION OF DOCKET #28 filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Responses due by 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Jodlowski in support thereof, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mitchell, David) (Filed on 1/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 19, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document #28 listed case numbers 5:20-cv-09092-BLF and 3:20-cv-09321-VC. This document is not applicable to those cases. Please re-file document in its entirety with only the case caption 4:20-cv-08984 HSG. [err102] Re: #28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Earlier Hearing Date re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #27 Renotice motion hearing MOTION for Hearing filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for John C. Herman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15452348.) filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. (Herman, John) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 28 ***RE-FILED AT DOC #30 *** ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Earlier Hearing Date re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #27 Renotice motion hearing , MOTION for Hearing filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Jodlowski in support thereof, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mitchell, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 27 Renotice motion hearing re #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed bySweepstakes Today, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #24 ) (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2021)[Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.] Modified on 8/20/2021 (sjo).
January 13, 2021 Reset Hearing as to #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, See Docket No. #27 : Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the #24 motion to consolidate. Hearing date of March 4, 2021, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. March 4th wasnt the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. If counsel would like to request an earlier date, an administrative motion or a stipulation and proposed order should be filed after the motion is re-noticed. And if granted, the Court will advance the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 25 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE STERLING INTERNATIONAL PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES (re #21 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/11/2021) Modified on 1/12/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 1/22/2021. Replies due by 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Jodlowski in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 1/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC ; Corporate Parent Google LLC for YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Schmidtlein (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Sophia M. Rios, #3 Proposed Order)(Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 1/7/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sweepstakes Today, LLC regarding service of Civil Standing Orders (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 1/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 5, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Judges name is incorrect on the signature line of the Proposed Order. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should refere nce the Judges name as Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on future filings. Re: #19 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by YouTube, LLC, Google LLC, Alphabet Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/4/2021)[Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 23, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 16th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:29-cv-08984-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/29/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sweepstakes Today, LLC.. (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/28/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Service waived by YouTube, LLC waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Service waived by Google LLC waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Service waived by Alphabet Inc. waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC Notice of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 12/22/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, and YouTube, LLC. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Jodlowski (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Mitchell (Mitchell, David) (Filed on 12/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/29/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sweepstakes Today, LLC (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Sherman Antitrust Act and the Clayton Act against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15321509.). Filed bySweepstakes Today, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Google Digital Publisher Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweepstakes Today, LLC
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: John Christopher Herman
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Daniel J. Pfefferbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genius Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Abby Lauren Dennis
Represented By: Brianna S. Hills
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Jamie L Boyer
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: Jonathon D. Byrer
Represented By: Marc Alfred Wallenstein
Represented By: Michael E. Klenov
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Sabria Alexandra McElroy
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Sean P. Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE NATION COMPANY, L.P.
Represented By: Abby Lauren Dennis
Represented By: Brianna S. Hills
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Jamie L Boyer
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: Jonathon D. Byrer
Represented By: Marc Alfred Wallenstein
Represented By: Michael E. Klenov
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Sabria Alexandra McElroy
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Sean P. Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Progressive, Inc
Represented By: Abby Lauren Dennis
Represented By: Brianna S. Hills
Represented By: Carol L. O'Keefe
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: George Andrew Zelcs
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Jamie L Boyer
Represented By: Jesse Michael Panuccio
Represented By: Jonathon D. Byrer
Represented By: Marc Alfred Wallenstein
Represented By: Michael E. Klenov
Represented By: Philip C. Korologos
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Robert E. Litan
Represented By: Ryan Z. Cortazar
Represented By: Sabria Alexandra McElroy
Represented By: Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Tillery
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Sean P. Rodriguez
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling International Consulting Group
Represented By: Eric L. Cramer
Represented By: Michael C Dell'Angelo, IV
Represented By: Patrick Fanning Madden
Represented By: Sophia Marie Rios
Represented By: Caitlin Goldwater Coslett
Represented By: Daniel John Walker
Represented By: Michaela Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark J. Astarita
Represented By: Jordan S. Elias
Represented By: Adam E Polk
Represented By: Dena C. Sharp
Represented By: Scott M Grzenczyk
Represented By: Jordan Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JLASALLE ENTERPRISES LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Gralewski, Jr.
Represented By: Karen M. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikula Web Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Stewart
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Kara A. Elgersma
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Represented By: Daniel Jay Nordin
Represented By: Dianne M. Nast
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Represented By: Marc Howard Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google L.L.C
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube L.L.C.
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?