SkinnySchool LLC et al v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: SkinnySchool LLC doing business as Maria Marques Fitness and Mint Rose Day Spa LLC
Defendant: Google L.L.C
Case Number: 1:2021cv07045
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
October 12, 2021 Filing 14 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2021 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Moya, Goretti)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The conference scheduled for Friday, September 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. will be held in Courtroom 11D at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Ceremonial Courtroom 9C is set as an overflow courtroom. Remote telephone information is provided below: Dial in: 1 888-363-4749; Access Code: 3667981. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (ama)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:21-cv-06011. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-md-03010-PKC. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 20, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York by MDL Panel. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC. Google LLC served on 8/12/21 via email, answer due 9/2/21. (Markert, Pamela) (Filed on 8/12/2021) Modified on 8/12/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mint Rose Day Spa LLC, SkinnySchool LLC.. (Markert, Pamela) (Filed on 8/12/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by SkinnySchool LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC. Service waived by Google LLC waiver sent on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Markert, Pamela) (Filed on 8/10/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2021 11:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/18/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Markert, Pamela) (Filed on 8/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16246952.). Filed bySkinnySchool LLC, Mint Rose Day Spa LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Markert, Pamela) (Filed on 8/3/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SkinnySchool LLC et al v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SkinnySchool LLC doing business as Maria Marques Fitness
Represented By: Pamela Ann Markert
Represented By: Solomon B. Cera
Represented By: Pamela A. Markert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mint Rose Day Spa LLC
Represented By: Pamela Ann Markert
Represented By: Solomon B. Cera
Represented By: Pamela A. Markert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?