Sherland v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: DENISE SHERLAND
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Postal Service and ERIK J. MORENO
Case Number: 1:2021cv07143
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 au
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on November 5, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by one week prior to conference, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. A template is available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-lewis-j-liman. This document should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with the Courts Individual Practices in Civil Cases, which are available on the same webpage. Parties should consult the Individual Practices for guidance on the matters to be discussed at the Initial Pretrial Conference and for the Court's rules with respect to communications with Chambers and other procedural matters. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 9/17/2021) (js)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Erik J. Moreno, The United States of America, United States Postal Service. (sj)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Simmons, Linda)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE and ERIK J. MORENO, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Denise Sherland..(Simmons, Linda)
August 31, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
August 31, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
August 31, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
August 31, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Linda Simmons. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 5,003,000; County code Bronx; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 5,300,000; the County code has been modified to Schenectady; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
August 31, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Linda Simmons to Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 31, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Linda Simmons to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; attach Civil Cover Sheet form ONLY. Summons request is filed as its own separate event. Re-file the Civil Cover Sheet document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
August 31, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #2 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-24977143, paid on 8/24/2021. (vf)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Simmons, Linda) Modified on 8/31/2021 (vf).
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Erik J. Moreno, The United States of America, United States Postal Service. Document filed by Denise Sherland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Police Report).(Simmons, Linda)
August 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Linda Simmons to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 8/30/2021. (vf)
August 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Linda Simmons. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
August 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Linda Simmons to Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Summons request not linked to Pleading.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Simmons, Linda) Modified on 8/25/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherland v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE SHERLAND
Represented By: Linda Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIK J. MORENO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?